Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1916152


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.05.2018 Change: Appeal number
22.05.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
18.05.2018 New entry: Appeal number
18.05.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
23.03.2018 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
23.03.2018 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.03.2018 Change - applicant published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
07.07.2017 Change - applicant published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
15.06.2017 Change - representative
27.04.2017 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
18.02.2017 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.10.2016 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
02.09.2016 Change - representative
19.08.2016 Opposition filed published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
08.07.2016 Change - representative
06.11.2015 (Expected) grant published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
28.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.10.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
06.10.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
02.10.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
04.06.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.10.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.10.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.11.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.10.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.10.2010 Deletion: Renewal fee paid
01.10.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.11.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
17.03.2009 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
10.02.2009 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.12.2008 Definitive list of designations published on  07.01.2009  [2009/02]
02.12.2008 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
10.10.2008 First examination report
08.10.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.09.2008 Request for examination filed published on  22.10.2008  [2008/43]
28.03.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.04.2008  [2008/18]