Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1916152
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1916152Global Dossier 09.12.2015B1
EP1916152 30.04.2008A1
Priority number Date
FR0609282 23.10.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2907392 26.06.2009B1
FR2907392 25.04.2008A1
Priority number Date
FR0609282 23.10.2006