Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2037585

EP2037585 - Method for notch filtering a digital signal, and corresponding electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.11.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics N.V.
WTC Schiphol Airport, Schiphol Boulevard 265
1118 BH Schiphol Airport Amsterdam / NL
For all designated states
STMicroelectronics SA
29, Boulevard Romain Rolland
92120 Montrouge / FR
[2009/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Pozsgay, Andras
408, route de la Grangeat
74130 Contamine sur Arve / FR
02 / Paillardet, Frédéric
24, les Hauts de Tresserve
73100 Tresserve / FR
 [2009/12]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/12]Zapalowicz, Francis
Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date07301367.414.09.2007
[2009/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2037585
Date:18.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:H03M7/00
[2009/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/12]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Notch-Filterung eines digitalen Signals und entsprechende elektronische Vorrichtung[2009/12]
English:Method for notch filtering a digital signal, and corresponding electronic device[2009/12]
French:Procédé de filtrage d'échancrure d'un signal numérique, et dispositif électronique correspondant[2009/12]
Examination procedure03.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/46]
12.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
25.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
25.01.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination15.03.2016Appeal received No.  T1264/16
11.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
22.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.02.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
23.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
24.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
23.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
22.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
28.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9615585  (AT & T WIRELESS COMMUNICAT [GB]; MCCABE DAVID JAMES [GB]) [X] 1-9 * page 8, line 10 - page 9, line 10; figures 3,4 *;
 [DA]WO2005015752  (ST MICROELECTRONICS INC [US]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - RODE J ET AL, "Transmitter architecture using digital generation of RF signals", RADIO AND WIRELESS CONFERENCE, 2003. RAWCON '03. PROCEEDINGS AUG. 10-13, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030810), ISBN 978-0-7803-7829-2, pages 245 - 248, XP010656743 [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - RIBNER D B, "MULTISTAGE BANDPASS DELTA SIGMA MODULATORS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS II: EXPRESS BRIEFS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19940601), vol. 41, no. 6, ISSN 1057-7130, pages 402 - 405, XP000460580 [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/82.300199
 [DA]  - TALEIE S M ET AL, "A Bandpass Delta Sigma RF-DAC with Embedded FIR Reconstruction Filter", SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE DIGEST OF TEC HNICAL PAPERS FEB. 6-9, 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20060206), ISBN 978-1-4244-0079-9, pages 2370 - 2379, XP010940644 [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSCC.2006.1696300