Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1820509

EP1820509 - Therapeutic preparation of very high purity FVlla and method for obtaining same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.11.2016Opposition rejectedpublished on 21.12.2016  [2016/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grifols, S.A.
C/Jesús y María, 6
08022 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2010/13]For all designated states
Grifols, S.A.
C/JESÚS Y MARÍA, 6
08022 Barcelona / ES
Former [2007/34]For all designated states
Grifols, S.A.
Marina, 16-18 Torre Mapfre - Pl. 26
08005 Barcelona / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Grancha Gamon, Salvador
c/Ma Deu de Montserrat 38 1° 2a
08401 Granollers (Barcelona) / ES
02 / Ristol Debart, Pere
c/ Alguersuari 71 7-2, Esc. 1
08203 Sabadell (Barcelona) / ES
03 / Jorquera Nieto, Juan Ignacio
c/ Frederic Mompou 11
08480 Ametlla del Valles (Barcelona) / ES
 [2007/34]
Representative(s)Durán Moya, Carlos , et al
DURAN-CORRETJER
Còrsega, 329
08037 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2007/34]Durán Moya, Carlos , et al
DURAN-CORRETJER Còrsega, 329
08037 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date07380021.105.02.2007
[2007/34]
Priority number, dateES2006000037317.02.2006         Original published format: ES 200600373
[2007/34]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1820509
Date:22.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1820509
Date:08.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/36, A61P7/04
[2007/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/34]
TitleGerman:Therapeutische Zubereitung von hochreinem FVIIa und Verfahren zu dessen Gewinnung[2007/34]
English:Therapeutic preparation of very high purity FVlla and method for obtaining same[2007/34]
French:Préparation thérapeutique de FVlla à pureté très élevée, et procédé pour l'obtenir[2007/34]
Examination procedure02.11.2007Examination requested  [2007/50]
30.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2009Fee for grant paid
13.05.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.04.2010   
CSL Behring GmbH
Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76
35041 Marburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hauser, Hans-Peter, et al
CSL Behring GmbH Patents & Licenses Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76
35041 Marburg / DE
 [2010/19]
17.05.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.09.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.12.2011Date of oral proceedings
13.01.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.01.2012Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
28.06.2016Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2016/51]
Appeal following opposition13.03.2012Appeal received No.  T0587/12
14.05.2012Statement of grounds filed
28.06.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
28.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
08.07.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY08.07.2009
DK08.07.2009
EE08.07.2009
LT08.07.2009
LV08.07.2009
RO08.07.2009
SI08.07.2009
BG08.10.2009
IS08.11.2009
LU05.02.2010
MC01.03.2010
[2015/22]
Former [2011/22]DK08.07.2009
EE08.07.2009
LT08.07.2009
LV08.07.2009
RO08.07.2009
SI08.07.2009
BG08.10.2009
IS08.11.2009
MC01.03.2010
Former [2010/27]DK08.07.2009
EE08.07.2009
LT08.07.2009
LV08.07.2009
RO08.07.2009
SI08.07.2009
BG08.10.2009
IS08.11.2009
Former [2010/20]DK08.07.2009
EE08.07.2009
LT08.07.2009
LV08.07.2009
SI08.07.2009
BG08.10.2009
IS08.11.2009
Former [2010/17]LT08.07.2009
LV08.07.2009
SI08.07.2009
BG08.10.2009
IS08.11.2009
Former [2010/05]SI08.07.2009
Documents cited:Search[DY]EP0346241  (FOND NAT TRANSFUSION SANGUINE [FR]) [DY] 1-5 * claims 13-15 * * examples 1-3 *;
 [DY]US4479938  (THOMAS WILLIAM R [US]) [DY] 1-5 * claims 1-7 * * example 1 *;
 [X]US2002115590  (JOHANNESSEN MARIE [DK], et al) [X] 1-5 * claims 1,2 * * paragraphs [0028] , [0052] , [0054] *;
 [XY]US5891843  (TURECEK PETER [AT], et al) [XY] 1-5 * abstract;; examples 1-8 * * column 4, lines 32-36 *;
 [A]US5344918  (DAZEY BERNARD [FR], et al) [A] 1-17 * claims 1,2 * * column 4, lines 63-68 *;
 [DX]  TOMOKIYO K ET AL, "Large-scale production and properties of human plasma-derived activated Factor VII concentrate", VOX SANGUINIS, S. KARGER AG, BASEL, CH, (200301), vol. 84, no. 1, ISSN 0042-9007, pages 54 - 64, XP002286502 [DX] 1-5 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1423-0410.2003.00247.x
 [X]  HEDNER U ET AL, "CLINICAL EXPERIENCE WITH HUMAN PLASMA-DERIVED FACTOR VIIA IN PATIENTS WITH HEMOPHILIA A AND HIGH TITER INHIBITORS", HAEMOSTASIS, BASEL, CH, (1989), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 335 - 343, XP009058664 [X] 1-5 * abstract * * page 336, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 337, column 1, paragraph 2 *
 [A]  BJOERN AND L THIM S ET AL, "Activation of coagulation factor VII to VIIa (S Bjoern and L Thim, Novo Research Institute)", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (198609), vol. 269, no. 60, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007110994 [A] 1-17 * whole document *