Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027892

EP2027892 - Stationary pedalling apparatus convertible into seat [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.03.2017  [2017/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wingroup, S. Coop.
Urarte kalea, 14
20500 Bergara / ES
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Lizarralde Ibarguren, Iñigo
Ibargarai 42-3º A
Bergara / ES
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Urteaga Simarro, José Antonio
31, Principe de Vergara St.
28001 Madrid / ES
[2009/09]
Application number, filing date07380238.120.08.2007
[2009/09]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027892
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:A63B22/06, A63B23/00
[2016/20]
Former International [2009/09]A63B21/22, A63B22/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:In einen Sitz umwandelbare stationäre Pedalvorrichtung[2009/09]
English:Stationary pedalling apparatus convertible into seat[2009/09]
French:Appareil de pédalage stationnaire convertible en siège[2009/09]
Examination procedure13.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/35]
13.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/09]
11.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/09]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
19.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201610   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2007049467  (LIN MICHAEL [TW]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0044] , [0048] , [0059]; figure - * [Y] 11,13;
 [X]EP0354785  (TOKYO SINTERED METALS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 5, lines 38-65 - column 6, lines 1-9; figure - *;
 [YA]WO2007055584  (BADARNEH ZIAD [NO], et al) [Y] 11,13 * page 1 - page 12; figure - * [A] 1-10;
 [A]US6126577  (CHANG JEFFERY [TW]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *