Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1820632

EP1820632 - Method and system for manufacturing a packaging unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.06.2010
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VEGA S.r.l.
Via Visconti di Modrone, 7
20100 Milano / IT
[2013/22]
Former [2013/07]For all designated states
VEGA S.r.l.
Via Fratta, 43
31023 Resana (TV) / IT
Former [2010/48]For all designated states
Vega SpA
Viale dell'Industria 6
20037 Paderno Dugnano (MI) / IT
Former [2007/34]For all designated states
Bent Christensen Holding ApS
Hojrupvej 11
5620 Glamsbjerg / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Christensen, Bent
Hojrupvej 13
5620 Glamsbjerg / DK
 [2007/34]
Representative(s)Pezzoli, Ennio , et al
c/o Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l.
Via Settembrini 40
20124 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2011/25]Pezzoli, Ennio , et al
c/o Maccalli & Pezzoli S.r.l. Via Settembrini 40
20124 Milano / IT
Former [2009/42]Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S
Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
Former [2007/34]Sundien, Thomas , et al
Zacco Denmark A/S, Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Application number, filing date07388009.820.02.2007
[2007/34]
Priority number, dateDK2006000024621.02.2006         Original published format: DK 200600246
[2007/34]
Filing languageDA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1820632
Date:22.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1820632
Date:28.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:B31B1/88, B31B1/16, B31B1/74
[2007/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/34]
Extension statesRS20.02.2008
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Maschine zur Herstellung von Verpackungszuschnitten[2007/34]
English:Method and system for manufacturing a packaging unit[2007/34]
French:Procédé et machine pour fabriquer des découpes d'emballage[2007/34]
Examination procedure20.02.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/14]
10.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2010Fee for grant paid
21.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.04.2011  15.04.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
 02  27.04.2011  04.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Chesapeake Limited
Church House St Marys Court The Broadway Old Amersham
Buckinghamshire HP7 0UT / GB
Opponent's representative
Dehns, et al
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 03  28.04.2011  06.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
BOBST MEX SA
Route de Faraz 3
1031 Mex / CH
Opponent's representative
Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al
Leonrodstraße 58
80636 München / DE
 [2019/52]
Former [2018/29]
Opponent(s)01  08.04.2011  15.04.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
 02  27.04.2011  04.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Chesapeake Limited
Church House St Marys Court The Broadway Old Amersham
Buckinghamshire HP7 0UT / GB
Opponent's representative
Dehns, et al
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 03  28.04.2011  06.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
BOBST MEX SA
Route de Faraz 3
1031 Mex / CH
Opponent's representative
Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al
Leonrodstraße 58
80636 München / DE
Former [2016/18]
Opponent(s)01  08.04.2011  15.04.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
 02  27.04.2011  04.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Chesapeake Limited
Church House St Marys Court The Broadway Old Amersham
Buckinghamshire HP7 0UT / GB
Opponent's representative
Leckey, David Herbert, et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
 03  28.04.2011  06.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
BOBST MEX SA
Route de Faraz 3
1031 Mex / CH
Opponent's representative
Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al
Leonrodstraße 58
80636 München / DE
Former [2015/45]
Opponent(s)01  08.04.2011  15.04.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
 02  27.04.2011  04.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Chesapeake Limited
Church House St Marys Court The Broadway Old Amersham
Buckinghamshire HP7 0UT / GB
Opponent's representative
Leckey, David Herbert, et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
 03  28.04.2011  06.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
BOBST SA
Case Postale
1001 Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, et al
Leonrodstraße 58
80636 München / DE
Former [2011/23]
Opponent(s)01  08.04.2011  15.04.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
D-69115 Heidelberg / DE
 02  27.04.2011  04.05.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Chesapeake Limited
Church House St Marys Court The Broadway Old Amersham
Buckinghamshire HP7 0UT / GB
Opponent's representative
Leckey, David Herbert, et al
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
 03  28.04.2011   
BOBST SA
Case Postale
1001 Lausanne / CH
Former [2011/22]
Opponent(s)01  08.04.2011  15.04.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
D-69115 Heidelberg / DE
 02  27.04.2011   
Chesapeake Limited
Church House St Marys Court The Broadway Old Amersham
Buckinghamshire HP7 0UT / GB
Opponent's representative
Leckey, David Herbert, et al
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2011/20]
Opponent(s)01  08.04.2011   
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
D-69115 Heidelberg / DE
06.06.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.12.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
20.10.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.10.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition07.12.2015Appeal received No.  T2199/15
26.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
18.12.2015Appeal received No.  T2199/15
19.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
17.11.2015Appeal received No.  T2199/15
11.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
11.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
CZ28.07.2010
EE28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
HU28.07.2010
LT28.07.2010
LV28.07.2010
RO28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
SK28.07.2010
TR28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
IS28.11.2010
PT29.11.2010
IE20.02.2011
LU20.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
ES21.02.2013
GR04.09.2013
SE21.02.2014
BE28.02.2014
DK28.02.2014
NL01.09.2014
[2015/08]
Former [2014/50]AT28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
CZ28.07.2010
EE28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
HU28.07.2010
LT28.07.2010
LV28.07.2010
RO28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
SK28.07.2010
TR28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
IS28.11.2010
PT29.11.2010
IE20.02.2011
LU20.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
ES21.02.2013
GR04.09.2013
SE21.02.2014
NL01.09.2014
Former [2014/37]AT28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
CZ28.07.2010
EE28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
HU28.07.2010
LT28.07.2010
LV28.07.2010
RO28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
SK28.07.2010
TR28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
IS28.11.2010
PT29.11.2010
IE20.02.2011
LU20.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
ES21.02.2013
GR04.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
CZ28.07.2010
EE28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
HU28.07.2010
LT28.07.2010
LV28.07.2010
RO28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
SK28.07.2010
TR28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
IS28.11.2010
PT29.11.2010
IE20.02.2011
LU20.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
GR04.09.2013
Former [2013/45]AT28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
CZ28.07.2010
EE28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
HU28.07.2010
LT28.07.2010
LV28.07.2010
RO28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
SK28.07.2010
TR28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
IS28.11.2010
PT29.11.2010
IE20.02.2011
LU20.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
Former [2013/44]AT28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
CZ28.07.2010
EE28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
LT28.07.2010
LV28.07.2010
RO28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
SK28.07.2010
TR28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
IS28.11.2010
PT29.11.2010
IE20.02.2011
LU20.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
Former [2011/29]AT28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
CZ28.07.2010
EE28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
LT28.07.2010
LV28.07.2010
RO28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
SK28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
IS28.11.2010
PT29.11.2010
Former [2011/22]AT28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
LT28.07.2010
LV28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
IS28.11.2010
PT29.11.2010
Documents cited:Search[PX]DE202005017869U  (ROSAS WOLF DAVID [DE]) [PX] 1-4,9-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2843911  (BRETONNE D ETIQUETTES SOC [FR]) [A] 1-4,9-11 * page 9, line 14 - page 10, line 30; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]FR2821290  (AQUITAINE DECOUPES [FR]) [A] 1,9 * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 31; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]JP2000025327  (OJI PAPER CO) [A] 1,9 * figures 1-7 *;
 [A]GB1060313  (AMERICAN CAN CO) [A] 1,9 * page 2, line 73 - line 99; figure 4 *