Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1873450

EP1873450 - A method for reducing nitrogen oxide emissions of a recovery boiler, and a recovery boiler [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.06.2014
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.07.2014  [2014/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metso Power Oy
P.O. Box 109
33101 Tampere / FI
[2008/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Raukola Antti
Seljatie 11
36200, Kangasala / FI
02 / Ylitalo Matti
Mustimäenkuja 18
33950, Pirkkala / FI
 [2008/01]
Representative(s)Rönkkö, Taina Mirjam , et al
Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy
Visiokatu 1
33720 Tampere / FI
[N/P]
Former [2008/01]Rönkkö, Taina Mirjam , et al
Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Hermiankatu 12 B
33720 Tampere / FI
Application number, filing date07397020.412.06.2007
[2008/01]
Priority number, dateFI2006000542921.06.2006         Original published format: FI 20065429
[2008/01]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1873450
Date:02.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1873450
Date:31.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:F23C6/04, F23G7/04
[2008/01]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2014/15]
Former [2008/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Reduktion von Stickstoffoxidemissionen eines Rückgewinnungskessels und Rückgewinnungskessel[2008/01]
English:A method for reducing nitrogen oxide emissions of a recovery boiler, and a recovery boiler[2008/01]
French:Procédé de réduction d'émissions d'oxyde d'azote pour une chaudière à récupération, et chaudière à récupération[2008/01]
Examination procedure03.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/31]
31.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2005118113  (ANDRITZ OY [FI]; CODA ZABETTA EDGARDO [FI]; HUPA MIKKO [FI]; SAVIHARJU) [X] 14 * page 4, line 30 - page 11, line 15 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 15-26;
 [A]US3574500  (HUOUVILAINEN REINO T) [A] 21-26 * column 2 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0761871  (MEAD CORP [US]) [A] 1-26 * column 2, line 29 - line 47 * * column 4, line 4 - column 7, line 30 * * figures 1, 1A *;
 [A]WO0037853  (COMBUSTION ENG [US]) [A] 1-26 * page 13, line 21 - page 24, line 26 * * figures 5-9, 12 *