Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027983

EP2027983 - Process and apparatus for injection molding of two plastic materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.01.2010
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.03.2010  [2010/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daviplast - Serviços de Consultoria, Sociedade Unipessoal LDA.
Avenida Do Infante 50
9000 Funchal, Madeira / PT
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Cassina, Virginio
Via Turati 8D
24020 Gorle (Bergano) / IT
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Perani, Aurelio , et al
Perani & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Perani, Aurelio , et al
Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5
20122 Milano / IT
Former [2009/09]Simino, Massimo , et al
Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza S. Babila, 5
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date07398012.021.08.2007
[2009/09]
Filing languagePT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027983
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:B29C45/16
[2009/09]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/44]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Spritzgiessen von zwei Kunststoffmaterialien[2009/09]
English:Process and apparatus for injection molding of two plastic materials[2009/09]
French:Procédé et appareil pour la moulure par injection de deux matériaux plastiques[2009/09]
Examination procedure26.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/09]
01.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/09]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH02227228  (NISSEI PLASTICS IND CO) [X] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [X]FR2656279  (SCHRADER [FR]) [X] 1-15 * page 2, line 14 - page 6, line 30; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US4754892  (RETIEF CHARLES T [ZA]) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line L; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US5447674  (SCHELLENBACH FRANK [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 22 - column 6, line 28; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE19508509  (SOOTH JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 55; figures 1-6 *