Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020205

EP2020205 - Ophthalmologic measuring device and measuring method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIS AG, Surgical Instrument Systems
Allmendstrasse 11
2562 Port / CH
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / RATHJEN, Christian
Warturmer Heerstrasse 152
28197 Bremen / DE
 [2016/13]
Former [2009/06]01 / Warturmer, Rathjen Christian
Heerstrasse 152
28197 Bremen / DE
Representative(s)Rentsch Partner AG
Bellerivestrasse 203
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2012/32]Rentsch Partner AG
Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte
Fraumünsterstrasse 9
Postfach 2441
8022 Zürich / CH
Former [2009/06]Vogel, Dany , et al
Rentsch & Partner Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9
8022 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date07405214.324.07.2007
[2009/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2020205
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020205
Date:13.04.2016
Language:DE
[2016/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B3/00, A61B3/10, A61B3/12
[2015/44]
Former International [2009/06]A61B3/10, A61B3/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/15]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Ophthalmologische Messvorrichtung und Messverfahren[2009/06]
English:Ophthalmologic measuring device and measuring method[2009/06]
French:Dispositif de mesure ophtalmologique et procédé de mesure[2009/06]
Examination procedure08.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/22]
15.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2016Fee for grant paid
17.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP11166277.1  / EP2359743
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.05.2009
Opposition(s)16.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
19.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
17.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
21.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
21.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.07.2007
BG13.04.2016
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
TR13.04.2016
GR14.07.2016
AT24.07.2016
IE24.07.2016
LU24.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/33]HU24.07.2007
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
IS13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
MT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
TR13.04.2016
GR14.07.2016
AT24.07.2016
IE24.07.2016
LU24.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2018/29]HU24.07.2007
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
TR13.04.2016
GR14.07.2016
AT24.07.2016
IE24.07.2016
LU24.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2018/28]HU24.07.2007
CY13.04.2016
CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
GR14.07.2016
AT24.07.2016
IE24.07.2016
LU24.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/49]CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
GR14.07.2016
AT24.07.2016
IE24.07.2016
LU24.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SI13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
GR14.07.2016
IE24.07.2016
LU24.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/22]CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
MC13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
GR14.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
SK13.04.2016
GR14.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ13.04.2016
DK13.04.2016
EE13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
RO13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
GR14.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/07]DK13.04.2016
ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
GR14.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2017/03]ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
GR14.07.2016
BE31.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/52]ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
SE13.04.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/51]ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
GR14.07.2016
PT16.08.2016
Former [2016/50]ES13.04.2016
FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
LV13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
Former [2016/49]FI13.04.2016
LT13.04.2016
NL13.04.2016
PL13.04.2016
Former [2016/46]LT13.04.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]US5387951  (HATANAKA HIDEKI [JP]) [X] 1-4,11,19 * abstract * * figures 1,3,4 * * column 3 - column 6 *;
 [X]US6779891  (BARTH ROLAND [DE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 2 * * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]WO2005074789  (ZEISS CARL MEDITEC AG [DE], et al) [A] 15,16 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19713138  (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2005203422  (WEI JAY [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * figure 4 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0027] * * claims 1-10 *;
 [AD]US5347328  (SEKINE AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-22 * abstract * * column 1 - column 4 * * claims 1-7 *;
 [A]WO0217775  (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * figure 1 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]US6454761  (FREEDMAN PHILIP D [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 4 - column 5 *
 [A]  WOJTKOWSKI M ET AL, "In vivo human retinal imaging by Fourier domain optical coherence tomography", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL OPTICS, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, WA, US, (200207), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 1083-3668, pages 457 - 463, XP002272406 [A] 10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.1482379
ExaminationEP1430829
by applicantUS5347328
 US6779891
 US5387951