EP2023058 - Connecting piece for the fluid circulation with inner circulation pipe for a service water or heating water supply facility, pipe assembly with such a connecting piece and method for assembling such a pipe assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geberit International AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | [2015/39] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Geberit International AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | ||
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states GEBERIT TECHNIK AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schüpbach, Michael Laubisrütistrasse 75b 8713 Uerikon / CH | 02 /
Doerr, Martin Buchenweg 1 72514 Inzigkofen / DE | 03 /
Pfeiffer, Uwe Krontaler Strasse 24 13125 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Keine, Ulrich Reper Höhe 11 57439 Attendorn / DE | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2009/07] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 07405219.2 | 26.07.2007 | [2009/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2023058 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2023058 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F24D17/00, F16L39/00, F24H9/12 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
F24D17/0078 (EP);
F16L39/005 (EP);
F24D17/0084 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/07] | F24H9/12, F16L39/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/39] |
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anschlussstück für einen eine Innenzirkulationsleitung aufweisenden Flüssigkeitskreislauf einer Brauchwasser- oder Heizwasserversorgungsanlage, Leitungsanordnung mit einem solchen Anschlussstück und Verfahren zum Montieren einer solchen Leitungsanordnung | [2009/07] | English: | Connecting piece for the fluid circulation with inner circulation pipe for a service water or heating water supply facility, pipe assembly with such a connecting piece and method for assembling such a pipe assembly | [2009/07] | French: | Elément de raccordement pour un circuit de liquide comportant une conduite de circulation interne d'une installation d'alimentation en eaux usées ou en eau chaude, installation de conduite dotée d'un tel élément de raccord et procédé destiné à monter une telle installation de conduite | [2009/07] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 15.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.07.2007 | BG | 23.09.2015 | CY | 23.09.2015 | CZ | 23.09.2015 | DK | 23.09.2015 | EE | 23.09.2015 | ES | 23.09.2015 | FI | 23.09.2015 | LT | 23.09.2015 | LV | 23.09.2015 | MC | 23.09.2015 | MT | 23.09.2015 | NL | 23.09.2015 | PL | 23.09.2015 | RO | 23.09.2015 | SE | 23.09.2015 | SI | 23.09.2015 | SK | 23.09.2015 | TR | 23.09.2015 | GR | 24.12.2015 | IS | 23.01.2016 | PT | 25.01.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 26.07.2007 | |
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
TR | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 26.07.2007 | |
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
TR | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.07.2007 | |
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 23.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0997690 (KEMPER GEBR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]WO02081978 (BRAATHEN THOR F [NO]) [X] 1-3,7-11 * page 4, line 9 - page 9, line 15; figures 1,6 *; | [X]DE4331194 (BRAAS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,9-11 * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 60; figure 2 * | by applicant | EP0299471 | EP0665408 | EP0997690 |