Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1932607

EP1932607 - Workpiece holder for exact positioning on a clamping chuck and clamping device with a chuck and workpiece holder positioned exactly thereon [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Erowa AG
Winkelstrasse 8
5734 Reinach / CH
[2008/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Sandmeier, Bruno
Egliswilerstrasse 33
5707 Seengen / CH
 [2008/25]
Representative(s)Rottmann, Maximilian
Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG
Gartenstrasse 28 A
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2010/01]Rottmann, Maximilian
Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37
8052 Zürich / CH
Former [2008/25]Rottmann, Maximilian
Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37
8052 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date07405307.515.10.2007
[2008/25]
Priority number, dateCH2006000203014.12.2006         Original published format: CH 20302006
[2008/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1932607
Date:18.06.2008
Language:DE
[2008/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1932607
Date:25.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:B23B31/34, B23Q3/18, B23B31/20, B23B31/107
[2008/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/25]
TitleGerman:Werkstückträger zum positionsgenauen Festlegen an einem Spannfutter sowie Spannvorrichtung mit einem Spannfutter und einem positionsgenau daran festspannbaren Werkstückträger[2008/25]
English:Workpiece holder for exact positioning on a clamping chuck and clamping device with a chuck and workpiece holder positioned exactly thereon[2008/25]
French:Support de pièce à usiner destiné à la fixation exacte sur un mandrin ainsi que dispositif à mandrin doté d'un mandrin et d'un support de pièce à usiner fixé fermement et positionné exactement sur celui-ci[2008/25]
Examination procedure25.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/32]
27.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2009Fee for grant paid
08.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
LU15.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/33]DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
LU15.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2011/22]DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
LU15.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2010/27]DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2010/17]DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/05]DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]DE861948  (MANNESMANN ROEHREN WERKE AG) [A] 1,15 * page 2, line 61 - line 107 * * figure - *;
 [A]EP0900618  (3R SYST INT AB [SE]) [A] 1,15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0023] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US3023015  (PANKOW MELVIN W) [A] 1,15 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 45 * * figure - *;
 [A]EP0970769  (HOUSE BM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,15 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0057] * * figures 1-9b *;
 [A]EP1442832  (METTCHEN JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1,15 * paragraph [0049] * * figure 7 *;
 [A]EP1068919  (EROWA AG [CH]) [A] 1,15 * the whole document * * paragraph [0033] *;
 [DA]EP0255042  (3R MANAGEMENT AB [SE]) [DA] 1,15 * the whole document *