Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1987930

EP1987930 - Method and apparatus for forming articles made of loose material to provide doors, casings or others [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  14.01.2011
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.01.2011Refusal of applicationpublished on 16.02.2011  [2011/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMAL S.r.l
Via Rosalba Carriera, 63
41010 San Damaso (MO) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]For all designated states
Imal S.R.L.
Via Rosalba Carriera 63 41010 San Damaso
Modena / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Benedetti, Paolo
Via del Girasole, 8
41010 Modena- Frazione San Damaso / IT
 [2008/45]
Representative(s)Alagem Modiano, Lara S. , et al
Modiano Gardi Patents
Via Meravigli 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Alagem Modiano, Lara S. , et al
Modiano Gardi Patents Via Meravigli 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date07425261.004.05.2007
[2008/45]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1987930
Date:05.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:B27N3/08
[2008/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT [2009/28]
Former [2008/45]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Artikeln aus losem Material zur Bereitstellung von Türen, Gehäusen und Anderem[2008/45]
English:Method and apparatus for forming articles made of loose material to provide doors, casings or others[2008/45]
French:Procédé et appareil pour former des articles composés de matériaux mous pour préparer des portes, cadres ou autres[2008/45]
Examination procedure15.05.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.05.2008Examination requested  [2008/45]
28.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.06.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
21.09.2010Date of oral proceedings
28.09.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/07]
09.12.2010Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201004   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3103254  (STEDMAN CRESSWELL E) [X] 1,2,4,15,16 * column 4; figures 1-11; claims 1,11,17,20 * * column 7, lines 8-51 *;
 [X]US4812188  (HANSEN HARDY V [DK]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 3; figure -; claims 1-4 *;
 [X]US4355754  (LUND ANDERS E ET AL) [X] 1,3,15 * column 4, lines 9-27; figures 1-4; claim 27 * * column 5, lines 1-21 *;
 [X]EP0774316  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 5-14 * columns 9,10; figures 1,2,4 *;
 [XA]US2003230827  (SOH SUNG KUK [US]) [X] 1,3,4,15 * paragraphs [0024] , [0065] , [0066] , [0086] - [0088] - [0094]; figures 1,10,11 * [A] 5-12
by applicantWO2005046950
 US5100601