Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020669

EP2020669 - Electrical connection auxiliary module for circuit breakers. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.10.2012
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bticino S.p.A.
Via Messina, 38
20154 Milano / IT
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Boffelli, Roberto
Via Todeschini, 29/A
24030 Mozzo (Bergamo) / IT
02 / Mostosi, Ivano
Via E. Vacha, 20
24123 Bergamo / IT
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Crippa, Paolo Ernesto , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Piazza della Vittoria 11
25122 Brescia / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/06]Crippa, Paolo Ernesto , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11
25122 Brescia / IT
Application number, filing date07425477.230.07.2007
[2009/06]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2020669
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020669
Date:30.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01H71/02
[2009/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Verbindungshilfsmodul für Schutzschalter[2009/06]
English:Electrical connection auxiliary module for circuit breakers.[2009/06]
French:Module auxiliaire de connexion électrique pour disjoncteur[2009/06]
Examination procedure23.06.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/31]
18.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2011Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.09.2011
24.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2011Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
20.10.2011Fee for grant paid
20.10.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2010
Opposition(s)31.08.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
09.11.2010Request for further processing filed
09.11.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.11.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.07.2007
AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
FI30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
MT30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
ES11.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
GB30.07.2012
IE30.07.2012
LU30.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
FI30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
MT30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
ES11.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
GB30.07.2012
IE30.07.2012
LU30.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/35]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
FI30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
MT30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
ES11.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
GB30.07.2012
IE30.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/33]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
FI30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
ES11.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
GB30.07.2012
IE30.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/29]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
FI30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
ES11.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
GB30.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/22]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
ES11.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
GB30.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/21]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
GB30.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/20]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/11]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/07]AT30.11.2011
BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/36]BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
RO30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
SK30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/35]BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
DK30.11.2011
EE30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
BG29.02.2012
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/34]BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
CZ30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/28]BE30.11.2011
CY30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/25]BE30.11.2011
LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/24]LT30.11.2011
LV30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
SE30.11.2011
SI30.11.2011
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/23]LT30.11.2011
NL30.11.2011
GR01.03.2012
IS30.03.2012
PT30.03.2012
Former [2012/21]LT30.11.2011
IS30.03.2012
Former [2012/20]LT30.11.2011
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No Search
Examination FR2796768
  DE2552521
by applicant FR2796768