Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020572

EP2020572 - Automatic device for the ignition and control of a gas apparatus and relative driving method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.11.2013
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sit la Precisa S.p.a.
Via dell'Industria, 31/33
35129 Padova / IT
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Peruch, Lino
Via Cal di Livera 90
31029 Vittorio Veneto (Treviso) / IT
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Ferreccio, Rinaldo
Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11
20124 Milano / IT
[2012/52]
Former [2009/06]Ferreccio, Rinaldo
c/o Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Locatelli 5
20124 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date07425487.131.07.2007
[2009/06]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2020572
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020572
Date:26.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:F23N1/00, F23N5/12
[2012/21]
Former International [2009/06]F23N5/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
TitleGerman:Automatische Vorrichtung zur Zündung und Steuerung eines Gasgeräts und entsprechendes Antriebsverfahren[2009/06]
English:Automatic device for the ignition and control of a gas apparatus and relative driving method[2009/06]
French:Dispositif automatique pour l'allumage et le contrôle d'un appareil à gaz et procédé de commande correspondant[2009/06]
Examination procedure03.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/38]
01.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2012Fee for grant paid
09.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.10.2009
Opposition(s)27.09.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.07.2007
AT26.12.2012
CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
MC26.12.2012
MT26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
TR26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
IE31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
LU31.07.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT26.12.2012
CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
MC26.12.2012
MT26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
TR26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
IE31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/33]AT26.12.2012
CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
MC26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
IE31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/24]AT26.12.2012
CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
MC26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/20]AT26.12.2012
CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
MC26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/14]AT26.12.2012
CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
MC26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2013/52]AT26.12.2012
CY26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2013/40]AT26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
PT26.04.2013
Former [2013/37]AT26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
RO26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
Former [2013/36]AT26.12.2012
CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
PL26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
ES06.04.2013
IS26.04.2013
Former [2013/35]CZ26.12.2012
EE26.12.2012
FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
SK26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
Former [2013/34]FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
BG26.03.2013
GR27.03.2013
IS26.04.2013
Former [2013/26]FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
SI26.12.2012
GR27.03.2013
Former [2013/24]FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
GR27.03.2013
Former [2013/23]FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
LV26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
Former [2013/22]FI26.12.2012
LT26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
Former [2013/21]LT26.12.2012
SE26.12.2012
Former [2013/20]LT26.12.2012
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1070919  (FAGOR S COOP [ES]) [X] 1-6,19-23 * paragraphs [0029] - [0039] - [0043] , [0044]; figures 4,6,7,9 * [Y] 9,26;
 [Y]DE19509797  (HONEYWELL BV [NL]) [Y] 9,26 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1394469  (RB CONTROLS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,19 * paragraphs [0013] - [0017]; figure 1 *
by applicantEP1070919