EP2025947 - Hub-profile connection system for axial fan and axial fan provided with this connection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.E.M. HOLDING S.R.L. Piazzale Luigi Cadorna 4 Milan / IT | [2013/09] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states R.E.M. HOLDING S.R.L. Piazzale Luigi Cadorne 4 Milan / IT | ||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Mosiewicz, Roberto Eduardo Via Per Binda 8 28049 Stresa / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mosiewicz, Roberto Eduardo via Arciprete Graziano Ponzone 14 Arona (NO) / IT | [2012/38] |
Former [2009/08] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Cinquantini, Bruno Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Cinquantini, Bruno Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/08] | Cinquantini, Bruno Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07425496.2 | 31.07.2007 | [2009/08] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2025947 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2025947 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/34 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
F04D29/34 (EP,US);
F04D29/382 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | Nabenprofilverbindungssystem für einen Axiallüfter und mit diesem Verbindungssystem ausgestatteter Axiallüfter | [2009/08] | English: | Hub-profile connection system for axial fan and axial fan provided with this connection system | [2009/08] | French: | Système de connexion de profil de moyeu pour ventilateur axial et ventilateur axial doté de ce système de connexion | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.2010 | 31.07.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2007 | AT | 27.02.2013 | BE | 27.02.2013 | CY | 27.02.2013 | CZ | 27.02.2013 | DK | 27.02.2013 | EE | 27.02.2013 | FI | 27.02.2013 | LT | 27.02.2013 | LV | 27.02.2013 | MC | 27.02.2013 | MT | 27.02.2013 | NL | 27.02.2013 | PL | 27.02.2013 | RO | 27.02.2013 | SE | 27.02.2013 | SI | 27.02.2013 | SK | 27.02.2013 | TR | 27.02.2013 | BG | 27.05.2013 | GR | 28.05.2013 | ES | 07.06.2013 | IS | 27.06.2013 | PT | 27.06.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | IE | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | LU | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
MT | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
TR | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
ES | 07.06.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.02.2013 | |
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004009064 (YOUNG STANFIELD [US]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006140770 (LIU CHING-WEN [TW]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006024165 (GAJEWSKI MARK [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US1501201 (CATES LAURENCE A) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1571345 (LEROY SOMER MOTEURS [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |