Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023466

EP2023466 - Electric motor with plastic casing provided with anchoring means with a tight seal for the power cable [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.11.2011
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELCO - E - TRADE S.R.L.
Via per Orio 18
24126 Bergamo / IT
[2011/16]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
ELCO S.p.A.
Via Per Orio, 18
24100 Bergamo / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Colombo, Enzo
Via Palma il Vecchio 10
24049 Verdello - Bergamo / IT
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Petruzziello, Aldo , et al
Racheli S.r.l.
Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2011/02]Petruzziello, Aldo , et al
Racheli S.R.L. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
Former [2009/07]Petruzziello, Aldo , et al
Racheli & C. S.p.A. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date07425526.610.08.2007
[2009/07]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023466
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2023466
Date:12.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:H02K5/22, H02G3/08
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
TitleGerman:Elektromotor mit Kunststoffgehäuse mit Verankerungsvorrichtung mit fester Abdichtung für das Stromkabel[2009/07]
English:Electric motor with plastic casing provided with anchoring means with a tight seal for the power cable[2009/07]
French:Moteur électrique doté d'un boîtier plastique doté d'un moyen d'ancrage avec un joint étanche pour le câble électrique[2009/07]
Examination procedure05.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/38]
10.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2010Fee for grant paid
24.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
HU12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
RO12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
IE10.08.2011
LU10.08.2011
CH31.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/25]BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
RO12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
IE10.08.2011
LU10.08.2011
CH31.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/37]BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
RO12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
IE10.08.2011
CH31.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/35]BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
RO12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
IE10.08.2011
CH31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/20]BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
RO12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
CH31.08.2011
LI31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/18]BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
RO12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
MC31.08.2011
Former [2012/05]BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
MT12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
RO12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
Former [2011/50]BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
CZ12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
RO12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
SK12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
Former [2011/47]BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
DK12.01.2011
EE12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
Former [2011/38]BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
NL12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
Former [2011/37]BE12.01.2011
CY12.01.2011
FI12.01.2011
LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
SI12.01.2011
BG12.04.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
Former [2011/36]LT12.01.2011
LV12.01.2011
PL12.01.2011
IS12.05.2011
PT12.05.2011
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE10113559  (BTM S R L [IT]) [X] 1,3,6-10 * figure 2 * [Y] 1,2,4,5,10;
 [Y]US2003000726  (MIYAKOSHI KOJI [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,10 * figure 11 *;
 [YA]US5777409  (KECK ARTHUR CARL [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,10 * figure 1 * [A] 1;
 [A]US2003136780  (SATO HIDETOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 3,4 * figure 1 *;
 [X]DE10234027  (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US2003102143  (SATO HIDETOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 6 * figure 4 *;
 [A]JPH11203972  (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [A] 5,7 * abstract * * figures 1,3C,3D *
by applicantDE10113559
 US2003000726