Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2045514

EP2045514 - Modular reflective optical lighting system and lighting device equipped therewith, in particular for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.11.2015
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2018New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Automotive Lighting Italia S.p.A.
Via Cavallo, 18
10078 Venaria Reale (Torino) / IT
[2009/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Pairetti, Alberto
Via Molino Colombini, 12
10064 Pinerolo / IT
02 / Pierro, Salvatore
Via Bonelli, 8
10100 Torino / IT
 [2009/15]
Representative(s)Bergadano, Mirko , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2015/50]
Former [2009/15]Bergadano, Mirko , et al
Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date07425625.605.10.2007
[2009/15]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2045514
Date:08.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2045514
Date:09.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:F21V7/00, F21S8/10, F21Y101/02
[2015/23]
Former International [2013/20]F21S8/10
Former International [2009/15]F21V7/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2015/50]
Former [2009/51]DE,  FR,  IT 
Former [2009/15]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Modulares reflektierendes optisches Beleuchtungssystem und Beleuchtungsvorrichtung, insbesondere für Fahrzeuge[2009/15]
English:Modular reflective optical lighting system and lighting device equipped therewith, in particular for vehicles[2009/15]
French:Système d'éclairage optique réflectif modulaire et dispositif d'éclairage équipé de celui-ci, en particulier pour véhicules[2009/15]
Examination procedure07.10.2009Examination requested  [2009/47]
09.10.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
09.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2015Fee for grant paid
15.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.11.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.09.2016   
Valeo Vision
34, rue Saint André
93012 Bobigny / FR
Opponent's representative
Gevers & Orès
Immeuble le Palatin 2
3 Cours du Triangle
CS 80165
92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2016/42]
Opponent(s)01  08.09.2016   
Valeo Vision
34, rue Saint André
93012 Bobigny / FR
Opponent's representative
Gevers & Orès
41 avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
20.10.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.02.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.03.2018Date of oral proceedings
09.04.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.04.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition04.06.2018Appeal received No.  T1369/18
08.08.2018Statement of grounds filed
28.05.2018Appeal received No.  T1369/18
02.08.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]DE102004025699  (ZIZALA LICHTSYSTEME GMBH WIESE [AT]) [X] 1,4,5,8-10,13 * paragraphs [0022] , [0025] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5396407  (TANIUCHI HITOSHI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 23 - line 33 * * figure 1 *
ExaminationUS2005088758
by applicantWO2007069123
 DE19820267
OppositionDE102004025699
 US5396407
 US2005088758
 EP1912018
 EP1388707