Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2050516

EP2050516 - Machine and method for continuously washing containers made of plastic material, and removal of contaminants and labels from their surface [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.11.2010
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SK
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amut S.p.A.
Via Cameri, 16
28100 Novara / IT
[2009/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Teruggi, Piergiorgio
c/o Amut S.p.A. Via Cameri, 16
28100 Novara (NO) / IT
 [2009/17]
Representative(s)Valentini, Giuliano
Marietti Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l.
Via Larga 16
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/17]Valentini, Giuliano
Marietti Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga 16
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date07425657.918.10.2007
[2009/17]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2050516
Date:22.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2050516
Date:15.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:B08B9/08, B29B17/02
[2009/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/17]
Extension statesAL25.09.2009
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum kontinuierlichen Waschen von Kunststoffbehältern, und Entfernen von Unreinheiten und Etiketten von deren Oberfläche[2009/17]
English:Machine and method for continuously washing containers made of plastic material, and removal of contaminants and labels from their surface[2009/17]
French:Dispositif et procédé pour le nettoyage en continu de conteneurs plastiques, ainsi que l'enlèvement de contaminants et d'étiquettes de leurs surfaces[2009/17]
Examination procedure25.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/45]
31.03.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.06.2010Fee for grant paid
30.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.08.2011  29.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
HERBOLD MECKESHEIM GMBH
Industriestrasse 33
74909 Meckesheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ullrich & Naumann, et al
PartG mbB
Schneidmühlstrasse 21
69115 Heidelberg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/23]
Opponent(s)01  16.08.2011  29.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
HERBOLD MECKESHEIM GMBH
Industriestrasse 33
74909 Meckesheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ullrich & Naumann, et al
PartG mbB
Schneidmuehlstrasse 21
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Former [2011/38]
Opponent(s)01  16.08.2011    ADMISSIBLE
HERBOLD MECKESHEIM GMBH
Industriestrasse 33
74909 Meckesheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Naumann, Ulrich
Ullrich & Naumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schneidmühlstrasse 21
69115 Heidelberg / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
20.10.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.02.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
01.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.02.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition09.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0569/16
03.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
19.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY15.12.2010
DK15.12.2010
EE15.12.2010
FI15.12.2010
HU15.12.2010
LT15.12.2010
LV15.12.2010
MT15.12.2010
SE15.12.2010
BG15.03.2011
IS15.04.2011
IE18.10.2011
LU18.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
CZ18.10.2018
RO18.10.2018
SK18.10.2018
SI19.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
NL01.11.2018
GR06.05.2019
[2019/40]
Former [2019/38]CY15.12.2010
DK15.12.2010
EE15.12.2010
FI15.12.2010
HU15.12.2010
LT15.12.2010
LV15.12.2010
MT15.12.2010
SE15.12.2010
BG15.03.2011
IS15.04.2011
IE18.10.2011
LU18.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
CZ18.10.2018
RO18.10.2018
SI19.10.2018
BE31.10.2018
NL01.11.2018
GR06.05.2019
Former [2019/37]CY15.12.2010
DK15.12.2010
EE15.12.2010
FI15.12.2010
HU15.12.2010
LT15.12.2010
LV15.12.2010
MT15.12.2010
SE15.12.2010
BG15.03.2011
IS15.04.2011
IE18.10.2011
LU18.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
CZ18.10.2018
RO18.10.2018
SI19.10.2018
NL01.11.2018
GR06.05.2019
Former [2019/35]CY15.12.2010
DK15.12.2010
EE15.12.2010
FI15.12.2010
HU15.12.2010
LT15.12.2010
LV15.12.2010
MT15.12.2010
SE15.12.2010
BG15.03.2011
IS15.04.2011
IE18.10.2011
LU18.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
CZ18.10.2018
NL01.11.2018
Former [2019/34]CY15.12.2010
DK15.12.2010
EE15.12.2010
FI15.12.2010
HU15.12.2010
LT15.12.2010
LV15.12.2010
MT15.12.2010
SE15.12.2010
BG15.03.2011
IS15.04.2011
IE18.10.2011
LU18.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
NL01.11.2018
Former [2013/45]CY15.12.2010
DK15.12.2010
EE15.12.2010
FI15.12.2010
HU15.12.2010
LT15.12.2010
LV15.12.2010
MT15.12.2010
SE15.12.2010
BG15.03.2011
IS15.04.2011
IE18.10.2011
LU18.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
Former [2011/38]CY15.12.2010
EE15.12.2010
FI15.12.2010
LT15.12.2010
LV15.12.2010
SE15.12.2010
BG15.03.2011
IS15.04.2011
Former [2011/29]CY15.12.2010
FI15.12.2010
LT15.12.2010
LV15.12.2010
SE15.12.2010
BG15.03.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19618363  (KRONSEDER MASCHF KRONES [DE]) [A] 1-36 * abstract *;
 [A]US4041963  (BABUNOVIC MOMIR) [A] 1-36 * abstract *;
 [A]US4209344  (SIMON JOSEPH F [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * abstract *;
 [A]US5566890  (RICCIARDELLI THOMAS E [US]) [A] 1-36 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS57159612  (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) [A] 1-36 * abstract *;
 [A]US3162204  (MOMIR BABUNOVIC, et al) [A] 1-36 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-4 *
by applicantEP0237127
 WO9955508