Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1968359

EP1968359 - Circuit and method of verifying the impedance of electrodes and of controlling the intensity of an electric stimulus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.01.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 13.06.2018  [2018/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Martin, Charles
Rue du Brouck 5
4450 Lantin / BE
[2008/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Frebel, Fabrice
Route du Pays de Liège 5
4020 Wandre / BE
 [2008/37]
Representative(s)Lerho, Marc J. A.
Pronovem - Office Van Malderen
Parc d'affaires Zénobe Gramme- bâtiment K
Square des Conduites d'eau 1-2
4020 Liège / BE
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Lerho, Marc J. A.
Pronovem - Office Van Malderen Boulevard de la Sauvenière 85/043
4000 Liège / BE
Application number, filing date07447016.207.03.2007
[2008/37]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1968359
Date:10.09.2008
Language:FR
[2008/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1968359
Date:02.03.2011
Language:FR
[2011/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:H05C1/04, A01K15/02
[2008/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/37]
TitleGerman:Schaltkreis und Verfahren zum Überprüfen der Impedanz von Elektroden und zur Steuerung der Intensität eines elektrischen Stimulus[2008/37]
English:Circuit and method of verifying the impedance of electrodes and of controlling the intensity of an electric stimulus[2008/37]
French:Circuit et méthode de vérification de l'impédance d'électrodes et de contrôle de l'intensité d'un stimulus électrique[2008/37]
Examination procedure03.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/17]
02.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2011Fee for grant paid
12.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.12.2011   
Radio Systems Corporation
10427 PetSafe Way
Knoxville TN 37932 / US
Opponent's representative
Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang
Dreiköniggasse 10
89073 Ulm / DE
 [2012/02]
17.01.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.07.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.06.2014Date of oral proceedings
16.09.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.09.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition14.11.2014Appeal received No.  T2157/14
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
CZ02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
HU02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
MT02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
PL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
TR02.03.2011
LU07.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
GB07.03.2017
BE31.03.2017
[2018/24]
Former [2018/14]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
CZ02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
HU02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
MT02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
PL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
TR02.03.2011
LU07.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
GB07.03.2017
Former [2013/45]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
CZ02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
HU02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
MT02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
PL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
TR02.03.2011
LU07.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
Former [2013/44]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
CZ02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
IT02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
MT02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
PL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
TR02.03.2011
LU07.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
Former [2012/10]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
CZ02.03.2011
DK02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
MT02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
Former [2011/50]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
CZ02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
IS02.07.2011
PT04.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
Former [2011/49]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
CZ02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
RO02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
SK02.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
PT04.07.2011
Former [2011/47]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
EE02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
IE02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
PT04.07.2011
Former [2011/38]AT02.03.2011
CY02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
NL02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
Former [2011/37]CY02.03.2011
FI02.03.2011
LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
SI02.03.2011
BG02.06.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
Former [2011/36]LT02.03.2011
LV02.03.2011
SE02.03.2011
GR03.06.2011
ES13.06.2011
Documents cited:Search[XDA]US6327999  (GERIG DUANE A [US]) [XD] 1-3,9,11-14 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 28 * * column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 15 * * column 5, lines 25-44 * * column 6, lines 5-9 * * figures 1,2,4 * [A] 16-20;
 [XA]AU2005100421  (DEREK WILLIAMS) [X] 1,3,9,11,12 * page 4, lines 1-14 * * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 2 * * page 7, lines 3-18 * * page 8, lines 1-16 * * figure 2; claims 1,2 * [A] 16-20;
 [X]US2006169222  (GERIG DUANE A [US]) [X] 1,3,11,12 * page 1, paragraphs 7-11,17-18 * * page 2, paragraphs 20,21 * * figures 1,2,3A,3B *;
 [A]US5425330  (TOUCHTON SCOTT F [US], et al) [A] 1,11,12,16-20 * column 13, line 29 - column 15, line 9 * * figure 4C *;
 [A]US2002079909  (REEVES JACK HARTSTONE [NZ]) [A] 1,4,10,16 * page 1, paragraph 4 * * page 2, paragraph 19 - page 3, paragraph 27 * * figures 1,2 *
by applicantAU2005100421
 US2006169222