Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1982175

EP1982175 - METHOD FOR THE DETECTION OF VIRUS INFECTED CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  24.06.2011
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2011Refusal of applicationpublished on 27.07.2011  [2011/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Danmarks Tekniske Universitet
Anker Engelundsvej 1, Bygning 101 A
2800 Lyngby / DK
[2008/43]
Inventor(s)01 / JENSEN, Peter Ruhdal
So̸gårdsvej 15
DK-2820 Gentofte / DK
02 / MICHELSEN, Ole
Langetravs 2
DK-3220 Tisvildeleje / DK
 [2008/43]
Representative(s)Vingtoft, Knud Erik
Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DK
[N/P]
Former [2008/43]Vingtoft, Knud Erik
Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S, Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831
2100 Copenhagen O / DK
Application number, filing date07700171.716.01.2007
[2008/43]
WO2007DK50001
Priority number, dateUS20060759071P17.01.2006         Original published format: US 759071 P
[2008/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007082541
Date:26.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1982175
Date:22.10.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007
[2008/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/50, C12Q1/04
[2008/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/43]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VIRUSINFIZIERTER ZELLEN[2008/43]
English:METHOD FOR THE DETECTION OF VIRUS INFECTED CELLS[2008/43]
French:METHODE DE DETECTION DE CELLULES INFECTEES PAR UN VIRUS[2008/43]
Entry into regional phase11.08.2008National basic fee paid 
11.08.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.08.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.08.2008Examination requested  [2008/44]
24.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2011Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.02.2011
14.02.2011Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
07.03.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/30]
17.03.2011Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/30]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201105   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]  - BRUSSAARD CORINA P D ET AL, "Flow cytometric analyses of viral infection in two marine phytoplankton species, Micromonas pusilla (Prasinophyceae) and Phaeocystis pouchetii (Prymnesiophyceae)", JOURNAL OF PHYCOLOGY, (199910), vol. 35, no. 5, ISSN 0022-3646, pages 941 - 948, XP002379978 [A] 1 * abstract * * page 942, paragraphs MATERIALS-AND-METHODS *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1529-8817.1999.3550941.x
 [X]  - HAIDINGER W ET AL, "Online monitoring of Escherichia coli ghost production.", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY. JAN 2003, (200301), vol. 69, no. 1, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 468 - 474, XP002379980 [X] 1-7,10,11,13-21 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.69.1.468-474.2003
 [X]  - BUNTHOF CHRISTINE J ET AL, "Rapid fluorescence assessment of the viability of stressed Lactococcus lactis", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (199908), vol. 65, no. 8, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 3681 - 3689, XP002379981 [X] 1,2,4,5,8-17 * abstract * * page 3689, paragraph LAST *
 [X]  - BUNTHOF CHRISTINE J ET AL, "Fluorescence assessment of Lactococcus lactis viability", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF FOOD MICROBIOLOGY, (20000410), vol. 55, no. 1-3, ISSN 0168-1605, pages 291 - 294, XP002379982 [X] 1-17,20,21 * abstract * * page 292, paragraph 3 * * page 293, paragraph 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1605(00)00170-7
 [X]  - SHEEHAN A ET AL, "Cheddar cheese cooking temperature induces differential lactococcal cell permeabilization and autolytic responses as detected by flow cytometry: implications for intracellular enzyme accessibility", JOURNAL OF APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 99, no. 5, ISSN 1364-5072, pages 1007 - 1018, XP002379983 [X] 1-18,21 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2672.2005.02718.x
 [X]  - ANANTA EDWIN, "Impact of environmental factors on viability and stability and high pressure pretreatment on stress tolerance of Lactobacillus rhamnosus GG (ATCC 53103) during spray drying", Berlin, (2005), pages 1 - 227, Dissertation, URL: http://opus.kobv.de/tuberlin/volltexte/2005/1119/pdf/ananta_edwin.pdf, (20060504), XP002379984 [X] 1-17,20,21 * paragraph [2.1.2] * * figures 4-8,15,17 * * paragraph [02.3] *
 [X]  - SURJAWAN I ET AL, "Effect of c2 phage peptide on acid development in milk inoculated with Lactococcus lactis spp lactis C2 with and without c2 phage infection.", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE, & JOINT ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN DAIRY SCIENCE ASSOCIATION, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF ANIMAL SCIEN; PHOENIX, ARIZONA, USA; JUNE 22-26, 2003, (2003), vol. 86, no. Supplement 1, ISSN 0022-0302, page 363, XP008063833 [X] 1,2,4,8-12,18,19 * abstract *
 [X]  - BUNTHOF C J ET AL, "Fluorescent method for monitoring cheese starter permeabilization and lysis.", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY SEP 2001, (200109), vol. 67, no. 9, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 4264 - 4271, XP002454713 [X] 1-17,20,21 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.67.9.4264-4271.2001