Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1979782

EP1979782 - PLASTIC FLAT DISPLAY AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  10.04.2009
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 13.05.2009  [2009/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Image Lab. Co., Ltd.
Room 304, Hanyang Business Incubator 1271, Sa-dong, Sangrok-gu
Ansan City, Gyeonggi-do 426-791 / KR
[2008/42]
Inventor(s)01 / JEONG, Seok-Hong
110-506 Shinyoungtong Hyundai Apt. 865-1, Banwol-ri, Taeahn-eup
Hwaseong City, Gyeonggi-do 445-982 / KR
02 / HWANG, Hyun-Ha
2-801, Donghyun Apt. 105, Nonhyeon-dong, Gangnam-gu
Seoul 135-010 / KR
 [2008/42]
Representative(s)Bungartz, Klaus Peter
Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen
Im Mediapark 6A
50670 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Bungartz, Klaus Peter
Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen Eupener Strasse 161a
50933 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date07701021.319.01.2007
[2008/42]
WO2007KR00314
Priority number, dateKR2006000618320.01.2006         Original published format: KR 20060006183
[2008/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007083938
Date:26.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1979782
Date:15.10.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007
[2008/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.07.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/1333
[2008/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/09]
Former [2008/42]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLACHBILDSCHIRM AUS KUNSTSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2008/42]
English:PLASTIC FLAT DISPLAY AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2008/42]
French:ECRAN PLAT EN PLASTIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2008/42]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2008National basic fee paid 
20.08.2008Search fee paid 
20.08.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2008Examination requested  [2008/42]
21.08.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
01.10.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
25.03.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2002180344  (LICHTFUSS HANS A [US]) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0018] - [0044]; figures 2-4 * [Y] 2,5,7,8,11,12;
 [Y]US4192060  (FUJISAWA ISAO [JP], et al) [Y] 2,5,7,8,11,12 * column 7, line 35 - column 9, line 34; figures 16A-16C *;
 [Y]EP1335211  (E INK CORP [US]) [Y] 7,12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0007]; figures 1,5A-5f *;
 [Y]US4526818  (HOSHIKAWA JUN [JP], et al) [Y] 8 * column 3, lines 20-26; figures 1,3 *;
 [PX]US2007008465  (DING JAU-MIN [TW], et al) [PX] 1,7 * paragraphs [0006] , [0017] - [0024]; figure 2 *;
 [A]  - YIP P K, "PLASTIC LCD WITH GRATINGS AS A BACKLIT DISPLAY PANEL", MOTOROLA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENTS, MOTOROLA INC. SCHAUMBURG, ILLINOIS, US, (19970901), vol. 32, ISSN 0887-5286, page 137/138, XP000741161 [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[A]US2004159710  (SILVERBROOK KIA [AU]);
 [A]US2005139684  (SILVERBROOK KIA [AU]);
 [A]JP2002014369  (OPTREX KK);
 [A]JPS6097325  (SHARP KK);
 [AP]US2006061541  (OU CHI-YUAN [TW], et al)