Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1977058 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 202
20.05.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.07.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
20.06.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.06.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.06.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
11.06.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
28.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.03.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
19.03.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
19.03.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.03.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.03.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 40
23.05.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
23.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
23.05.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
17.05.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.05.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.03.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
03.01.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.01.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
13.08.2010 Description Search / examination 3
13.08.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
15.07.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.07.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.02.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.02.2010 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
03.12.2009 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
16.11.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.11.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 3
16.11.2009 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
28.07.2009 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
10.09.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.08.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
29.07.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
29.07.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 3
29.07.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
07.07.2008 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
07.07.2008 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
13.06.2008 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
15.05.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.12.2007 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
30.07.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 16
12.07.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
12.07.2007 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 40