Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1977058


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017 [2017/46]
25.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.09.2017  [2017/39]
08.07.2016 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
06.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
18.09.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.10.2015  [2015/43]
19.06.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
22.05.2015 No opposition filed within time limit published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
01.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
24.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
13.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
06.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
30.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
23.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
16.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
13.06.2014 (Expected) grant published on  16.07.2014  [2014/29]
12.06.2014 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.04.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.04.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
18.03.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
31.01.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.05.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.05.2013 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.02.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.01.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.06.2012 Change - extension states published on  01.08.2012  [2012/31]
31.01.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.02.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.08.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.07.2010 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.02.2010 First examination report published on  31.03.2010  [2010/13]
23.02.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.01.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.11.2009 Supplementary search report published on  16.12.2009  [2009/51]
05.09.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.10.2008  [2008/41]
05.09.2008 Request for examination filed published on  08.10.2008  [2008/41]
03.09.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
13.08.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
13.08.2008 Amendment by applicant
13.08.2008 New entry: Fee payment for extension state
06.08.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.12.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
24.08.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
14.07.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
27.03.2007 PCT data prior to European publication