Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1977058

EP1977058 - AN AUTOMATED BRICK LAYING SYSTEM FOR CONSTRUCTING A BUILDING FROM A PLURALITY OF BRICKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.05.2015
Database last updated on 22.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): BE
published on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Goldwing Nominees Pty Ltd.
24 Adams Drive
Welshpool, Western Australia 6106 / AU
[2008/41]
Inventor(s)01 / PIVAC, Mark Joseph
11 Keane Way
Lesmurdie, Western Australia 6076 / AU
02 / WOOD, Michael Barrington
57 Clotilde Street
Mount Lawley, Western Australia 6050 / AU
 [2008/41]
Representative(s)Wagner, Bernhard Peter
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/29]Wagner, Bernhard Peter
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Former [2008/41]Wagner, Bernhard Peter
ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date07701350.602.01.2007
[2008/41]
WO2007AU00001
Priority number, dateAU2005090734730.12.2005         Original published format: AU 2005907347
[2008/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007076581
Date:12.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1977058
Date:08.10.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007
[2008/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1977058
Date:16.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/29]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
AU12.07.2007
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP16.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:E04G21/22, B25J9/16, B25J11/00
[2008/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/41]
Extension statesBA29.07.2008
HR29.07.2008
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISIERTES MAURERSYSTEM ZUM BAUEN EINES GEBÄUDES AUS MEHREREN MAUERSTEINEN[2008/41]
English:AN AUTOMATED BRICK LAYING SYSTEM FOR CONSTRUCTING A BUILDING FROM A PLURALITY OF BRICKS[2008/41]
French:SYSTEME AUTOMATISE DE POSE DE BRIQUES POUR CONSTRUIRE UN BATIMENT A PARTIR D'UNE PLURALITE DE BRIQUES[2008/41]
Entry into regional phase29.07.2008National basic fee paid 
29.07.2008Search fee paid 
29.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
29.07.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/41]
26.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2014Fee for grant paid
28.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.02.2010
Opposition(s)17.04.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
24.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
23.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2015/50]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/43]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/30]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/22]CY16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
IT16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/12]CY16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY16.07.2014
ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/10]ES16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT16.07.2014
Documents cited:Search[Y]CH673498  (THOMAS ALBERT PFISTER) [Y] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5284000  (MILNE W WARREN [CA], et al) [Y] 1-23 * column 4, line 43 - column 14, line 21; figure - *;
 [Y]DE19509809  (HOFMANN KONRAD [DE], et al) [Y] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE4417928  (LISSMAC MASCHB & DIAMANTWERKZ [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15,19-23 * column 4, lines 11-38 * * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 45 * * abstract *;
 [YA]EP0495525  (HARMONY HOLDINGS LTD [LI]) [Y] 16-18 * abstract * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 58 * * column 5, line 4 - column 6, line 3 * [A] 1-15,19-23;
 [YA]DE19603234  (WASMER PAUL [DE]) [Y] 16-18 * column 7, lines 44-64 * * claims 1-17 * * abstract * [A] 1-15,19-23
International search[X]WO2004083540  (ESSABE B V [NL], et al);
 [Y]DE4207384  (PINKHAUS ELMAR [DE]);
 [Y]DE19600006  (FREY KURT DIPL ING FH [DE]);
 [A]EP0836664  (OPFERKUCH BAU GMBH [AT], et al);
 [A]DE19743717  (WASMER PAUL [DE]);
 [A]US3950914  (LOWEN MICHAEL DAVID);
 [A]DE3430915  (KOBER HELMUT DIPL ING);
 [A]US5018923  (MELAN CORNEILLE [LU], et al);
 [A]DE29601535U  (WASMER PAUL [DE]);
 [A]US4245451  (TAYLOR-SMITH ERNEST J)
by applicantCH673498
 US5284000
 DE19509809
 DE4417928
 EP0495525
 DE19603234