Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1979028

EP1979028 - ATTACHMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/42]ATTACHMENT DEVICE AND METHOD
[2015/18]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2016
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kylie Annesley Lundqvist and Juanita Margaret Lundqvist as Trustees of Lundqvist Family Trust
44 D'aguilar Road
The Gap, Queensland 4061 / AU
[2015/39]
Former [2008/42]For all designated states
Kylie Annesley Lundqvist and Juanita Margaret Lundqvist as Trustees of Lundqvist family Trust
44 D'aguilar Road
The Gap, Queensland 4061 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / LUNDQVIST, Kristian
44 D'aguilar Road
The Gap, Queensland 4061 / AU
 [2008/42]
Representative(s)Ward, David Ian , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street
Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
[2015/39]
Former [2008/42]Hackett, Sean James
Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham
B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date07701372.015.01.2007
[2008/42]
WO2007AU00031
Priority number, dateAU2006090024718.01.2006         Original published format: AU 2006900247
AU2006090533627.09.2006         Original published format: AU 2006905336
[2008/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007082333
Date:26.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1979028
Date:15.10.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007
[2008/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1979028
Date:23.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU26.07.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/32
[2008/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/39]
Former [2008/42]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANBRINGVORRICHTUNG[2015/18]
English:ATTACHMENT DEVICE[2015/18]
French:APPAREIL D'ATTACHE[2015/18]
Former [2008/42]ANBRINGVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN
Former [2008/42]ATTACHMENT DEVICE AND METHOD
Former [2008/42]APPAREIL ET MÉTHODE D'ATTACHE
Entry into regional phase15.08.2008National basic fee paid 
15.08.2008Search fee paid 
15.08.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
15.08.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.08.2008Examination requested  [2008/42]
09.02.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2015Fee for grant paid
13.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.03.2013
Opposition(s)24.06.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
21.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.01.2007
AT23.09.2015
BE23.09.2015
BG23.09.2015
CY23.09.2015
CZ23.09.2015
DK23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
ES23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
IT23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
MC23.09.2015
NL23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SI23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
TR23.09.2015
GR24.12.2015
LU15.01.2016
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/33]HU15.01.2007
AT23.09.2015
BE23.09.2015
CY23.09.2015
CZ23.09.2015
DK23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
ES23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
IT23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
MC23.09.2015
NL23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SI23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
TR23.09.2015
GR24.12.2015
LU15.01.2016
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
Former [2018/28]HU15.01.2007
AT23.09.2015
BE23.09.2015
CY23.09.2015
CZ23.09.2015
DK23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
ES23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
IT23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
MC23.09.2015
NL23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SI23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
GR24.12.2015
LU15.01.2016
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
Former [2017/03]AT23.09.2015
BE23.09.2015
CZ23.09.2015
DK23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
ES23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
IT23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
MC23.09.2015
NL23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SI23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
GR24.12.2015
LU15.01.2016
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
Former [2016/49]AT23.09.2015
CZ23.09.2015
DK23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
ES23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
IT23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
MC23.09.2015
NL23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SI23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
GR24.12.2015
LU15.01.2016
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
Former [2016/42]AT23.09.2015
CZ23.09.2015
DK23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
ES23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
IT23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
MC23.09.2015
NL23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
GR24.12.2015
LU15.01.2016
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
Former [2016/39]AT23.09.2015
CZ23.09.2015
DK23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
ES23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
IT23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
NL23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
GR24.12.2015
LU15.01.2016
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
Former [2016/24]AT23.09.2015
CZ23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
ES23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
IT23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
NL23.09.2015
PL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
GR24.12.2015
IS23.01.2016
PT25.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
ES23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
IT23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
NL23.09.2015
RO23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
SK23.09.2015
GR24.12.2015
IS23.01.2016
Former [2016/22]CZ23.09.2015
EE23.09.2015
ES23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
IT23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
NL23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
GR24.12.2015
IS23.01.2016
Former [2016/21]ES23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
IT23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
NL23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
GR24.12.2015
Former [2016/20]ES23.09.2015
FI23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
NL23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
GR24.12.2015
Former [2016/14]FI23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
NL23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
GR24.12.2015
Former [2016/10]FI23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
SE23.09.2015
GR24.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI23.09.2015
LT23.09.2015
LV23.09.2015
GR24.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT23.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5470321  (FORSTER MICHEL CH [FR] ET AL) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 67 - column 4, line 16; figure - * [I] 5;
 [X]US5267970  (CHIN ALBERT K [US] ET AL) [X] 1,6-8 * page 6, line 47 - line 63; figure 12 *;
 [X]US2003167055  (KOLATA RONALD J [US] ET AL) [X] 1,6,7 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0054]; figures 3-4C *
International search[X]US2005256459  ;
 [A]US2004254536  ;
 [A]WO8403217  ;
 [A]US2004087996  ;
 [X]WO03092781  ;
 [X]US2004199122  ;
 [X]US2004204684  ;
 [X]US5755225