Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2007042

EP2007042 - WAVELENGTH DIVISION MULTIPLEXING SYSTEM AND RESIDUAL DISPERSION COMPENSATING DEVICE AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2008/52]For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Likun
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen
Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / WANG, Jiaying
ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen
Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2008/52]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/52]Hatzmann, Martin
Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date07702022.010.01.2007
[2008/52]
WO2007CN00090
Priority number, dateCN2006101147810.03.2006         Original published format: CN200610011478
[2008/52]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007104211
Date:20.09.2007
Language:ZH
[2007/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2007042
Date:24.12.2008
Language:EN
[2009/04]
Type: A9 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP2007042
Date:01.07.2009
[2009/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN20.09.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04B10/18, H04J14/02, // H04B10/08
[2012/10]
Former International [2008/52]H04B10/18, H04J14/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/52]
TitleGerman:WELLENLÄNGENMULTIPLEXSYSTEM UND RESTDISPERSIONSKOMPENSATIONSEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2008/52]
English:WAVELENGTH DIVISION MULTIPLEXING SYSTEM AND RESIDUAL DISPERSION COMPENSATING DEVICE AND METHOD THEREOF[2008/52]
French:SYSTÈME DE MULTIPLEXAGE PAR DIVISION DE LONGUEURS D'ONDE, DISPOSITIF DE COMPENSATION DE LA DISPERSION RÉSIDUELLE, ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ[2008/52]
Entry into regional phase25.09.2008Translation filed 
25.09.2008National basic fee paid 
25.09.2008Search fee paid 
25.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/52]
24.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.12.2014
02.12.2014Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
09.12.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
01.11.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/51]
Appeal following examination06.02.2015Appeal received No.  T1048/15
07.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
01.11.2019Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.02.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
17.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
30.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
30.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
29.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
25.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0700178  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,9-11,13 * abstract * * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 7 * * page 9, lines 10-49 * * page 11, line 57 - page 12, line 2 * * page 13, lines 13-24 * * figures 4, 8, 9, 15-19, 44-52, 56, 57 * [I] 5-8;
 [I]EP0902558  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [I] 1-11,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0047] - [0055] * * figures 21-27 *;
 [I]EP0812075  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA] NORTEL NETWORKS CORP [CA] NORTEL NETWORKS LT) [I] 1-11,13 * abstract * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 54 * * column 5, line 15 - column 7, line 49 * * figures 1, 2 *;
 [I]EP1385281  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [I] 1-11,13 * the whole document *
International search[X]CN1674475  ;
 [A]US6871024  ;
 [A]CN1479478  ;
 [A]CN1518249