Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1986867 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1986867



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1570
17.10.2018 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
15.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.10.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.10.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 23
10.10.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
11.04.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.04.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.04.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.04.2018 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 4
07.03.2018 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
07.03.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.02.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.02.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
23.02.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 25
23.02.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 42
23.02.2018 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 27
23.02.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.02.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
20.02.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.02.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
08.02.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.02.2018 Non-scannable object Appeal 44
08.02.2018 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
02.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.12.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
21.12.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
21.12.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 12
20.12.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
15.12.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.12.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
07.12.2017 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 9
16.11.2017 Request concerning the applicant/representative Appeal 2
22.08.2017 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 4
07.07.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 3
07.07.2017 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 1
19.05.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
19.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.05.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
10.05.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
24.10.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
24.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
13.09.2016 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
13.09.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
03.08.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
03.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.04.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 3
10.02.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
29.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.10.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 68
07.08.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.08.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
25.07.2014 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
25.07.2014 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
25.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.07.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.07.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 36
25.07.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
25.07.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
25.07.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
25.07.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 29
25.07.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
24.07.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
24.07.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 36
24.07.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
24.07.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
24.07.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
24.07.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 20
02.07.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
13.06.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
27.05.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
26.05.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.05.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
26.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.03.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.03.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
24.03.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
24.03.2014 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
24.03.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
24.03.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
24.03.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
24.03.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
24.03.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.03.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.03.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 59
04.02.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 36
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 2
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Claims Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
24.01.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
14.01.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
14.01.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
09.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
09.01.2014 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.01.2014 Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them Opposition 2
03.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
03.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
03.01.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
03.01.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
18.12.2013 Request for change of name -opponent Opposition 1
03.12.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.11.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.11.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
07.11.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.07.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
02.07.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
02.07.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.07.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.07.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 12
14.06.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.06.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.05.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.05.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
10.05.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
10.05.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.05.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 56
10.05.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 70
10.05.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
10.05.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
10.05.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
14.07.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.07.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.06.2011 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
20.06.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.06.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
21.02.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
21.02.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
21.02.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
21.02.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 68
27.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
27.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
27.07.2010 Description Search / examination 2
27.07.2010 Description Search / examination 2
27.07.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
08.06.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.05.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.01.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
27.01.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.10.2009 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.10.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
29.09.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
10.09.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
10.09.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
18.08.2008 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
27.06.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
09.05.2008 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.05.2008 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.05.2008 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.05.2008 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.05.2008 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.05.2008 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.05.2008 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.05.2008 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.02.2008 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
14.01.2008 Refund of fees PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.01.2008 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
08.01.2008 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.12.2007 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
27.12.2007 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
21.12.2007 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
21.12.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.12.2007 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
21.12.2007 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
21.12.2007 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
21.12.2007 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
15.11.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
15.11.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
15.11.2007 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
12.09.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 73
23.08.2007 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 72
05.02.2007 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
05.02.2007 Claims PCT receiving Office 8
05.02.2007 Description PCT receiving Office 47
05.02.2007 Drawings PCT receiving Office 16