EP2021607 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF THE EFFECTIVENESS OF A CATALYTIC CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIETL, Roland Eisenmannstr. 36 93049 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
RABL, Hans-Peter Hallstattstr. 39 93309 Kelheim / DE | 03 /
RADECZKY, Janos Am Osthang 7 93173 Wenzenbach / DE | [2009/07] | Application number, filing date | 07703967.5 | 18.01.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007EP50470 | Priority number, date | DE20061021091 | 05.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006021091 | [2009/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007128593 | Date: | 15.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2021607 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2021607 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/14, F02D41/18, F02D41/40, F01N11/00 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
F02D41/1495 (EP,US);
F01N11/00 (EP,US);
F01N3/2033 (EP,US);
F02B37/00 (EP,US);
F02D41/18 (EP,US);
F02D41/405 (EP,US);
F01N2550/02 (EP,US);
F02D41/0007 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/22] |
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DIAGNOSE DER WIRKSAMKEIT EINES ABGASKATALYSATORS | [2009/07] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF THE EFFECTIVENESS OF A CATALYTIC CONVERTER | [2009/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DIAGNOSTIC DE L'EFFICACITÉ D'UN CATALYSEUR DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 06.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.02.2010 | [2011/25] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10113010 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] * * paragraphs [0027] , [0030] , [0031] , [0033] , [0034]; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE10254477 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0009] * * paragraphs [0012] - [0017] - [0022]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4308894 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * column 1, line 18 - line 65 * * column 2, line 49 - line 57 *; | [A]EP1591651 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0033] , [0035] , [0037] *; | [A]EP1496225 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * |