Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2109594

EP2109594 - MINERAL FIBRE INSULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.06.2015
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
09.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Knauf Insulation
Rue de Maestricht 95
4600 Visé / BE
[2012/21]
Former [2010/33]For all designated states
Knauf Insulation SPRL
Rue de Maestricht 95
4600 Visé / BE
Former [2009/43]For all designated states
Knauf Insulation Limited
P.O. Box 10 Stafford Road St. Helens
Merseyside WA10 3NS / GB
Inventor(s)01 / JACKSON, Roger
P.O.Box 10 Stafford Road
St Helens Merseyside WA10 3NS / GB
02 / AINDOW, Tony
P.O. Box 10 Stafford Road
St Helens Merseyside WA10 3NS / GB
03 / BAYBUTT, George
P.O. Box 10 Stafford Road
St Helens Merseyside WA10 3NS / GB
 [2009/43]
Representative(s)ARC-IP
ARC-IP sprl
Rue Emile Francqui 4
1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE
[N/P]
Former [2009/43]Farmer, Guy Dominic , et al
ARC-IP Chaussée de La Hulpe, 185
1170 Bruxelles / BE
Application number, filing date07704141.625.01.2007
[2009/43]
WO2007EP50747
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008089848
Date:31.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2109594
Date:21.10.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2008
[2009/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:C04B26/18, C04B30/02
[2009/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/43]
Extension statesBA25.08.2009
HR25.08.2009
MK25.08.2009
RS25.08.2009
TitleGerman:MINERALFASERISOLIERUNG[2009/43]
English:MINERAL FIBRE INSULATION[2009/43]
French:ISOLATION PAR FIBRES MINÉRALES[2009/43]
Entry into regional phase25.08.2009National basic fee paid 
25.08.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/43]
03.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.08.2010Observations by third parties
16.03.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
16.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
20.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
06.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
28.02.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.03.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination31.03.2017Appeal received No.  T1968/17
12.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
13.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.12.2009
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
16.05.2011Request for further processing filed
16.05.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.05.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1382642  (ROCKWOOL INT [DK]) [X] 1-13,15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0041] *;
 [X]US2006252855  (PISANOVA ELENA [CA] ET AL) [X] 1-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0009] - [0027] - [0031] - [0038] , [0087] *;
 [X]FR2614388  (MICROPORE INTERNATIONAL LTD [GB]) [X] 16-19 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO2007014236  (KNAUF INSULATION GMBH [US]; SWIFT BRIAN LEE [US]; XU RUIJIAN [US]; KIS) [E] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5582682  (FERRETTI ARTHUR [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 13, line 20 - column 16, line 38 *;
 [A]EP0911361  (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6440204  (ROGOLS SAUL [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1486547  (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
otherWO9325490