Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1986637

EP1986637 - SULFONAMIDE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF BACTERIAL INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.11.2013
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.01.2014  [2014/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Serono SA
Centre Industriel
1267 Coinsins, Vaud / CH
[2009/25]
Former [2008/45]For all designated states
Laboratoires Serono SA
Centre Industriel
1267 Coinsins, Vaud / CH
Inventor(s)01 / GONZALEZ, Jerome
28 rue du Chablais
F-74100 Annemasse / FR
02 / SWINNEN, Dominique
65 Allée du Clos Romance
F-74160 Beaumont / FR
03 / BOMBRUN, Agnes
71 Chemin des Cornillons
CH-1292 Chambesy / CH
04 / HOOFT VAN HUIJSDUIJNEN, Rob
27 Chemin de la Lechaire
CH-1233 Bernex / CH
05 / WELLS, Timothy
2, avenue de la Foretaille
1292 Chambesy / FR
 [2009/01]
Former [2008/45]01 / GONZALEZ, Jerome
28 rue du Chablais
F-74100 Annemasse / FR
02 / SWINNEN, Dominique
65 Allée du Clos Romance
F-74160 Beaumont / FR
03 / BOMBRUN, Agnes
71 Chemin des Cornillons
CH-1292 Chambesy / CH
04 / HOOFT VAN HUIJSDUIJNEN, Rob
27 Chemin de la Lechaire
CH-1233 Bernex / CH
05 / WELLS, Timothy
712 route de Bellevue
F-01280 Prevessin Moens / FR
Representative(s)De Luca, Giampiero
Merck Serono International S.A.
Intellectual Property
9, chemin des Mines
1202 Genève / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]De Luca, Giampiero
Merck Serono International S.A. Intellectual Property 9, chemin des Mines
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date07704461.809.02.2007
[2008/45]
WO2007EP51242
Priority number, dateUS20060772793P13.02.2006         Original published format: US 772793 P
EP2006010157413.02.2006         Original published format: EP 06101574
[2008/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007093557
Date:23.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1986637
Date:05.11.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007
[2008/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/381, A61K31/4436, A61P31/04, A61P31/06, A61P11/00
[2008/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/45]
Extension statesAL03.09.2008
BA03.09.2008
HR03.09.2008
MK03.09.2008
RS03.09.2008
TitleGerman:SULFONAMID-DERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BAKTERIELLEN INFEKTIONEN[2008/45]
English:SULFONAMIDE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF BACTERIAL INFECTIONS[2008/45]
French:DÉRIVÉS DE SULFONAMIDE DANS LE TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS BACTÉRIENNES[2008/45]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2008National basic fee paid 
03.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/45]
23.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/01]
21.08.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/01]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.12.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201307   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO03064376  (APPLIED RESEARCH SYSTEMS [NL], et al) [AD] 1-23 * examples 24,125-140; claim - *;
 [A]US2006025445  (XIANG JASON S [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0137] , [0138] , [0192] , [0193] , [0258]; examples 1B,2C,2D,4H; claims 1,9 *;
 [A]WO2004103980  (BIOVITRUM AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 4, lines 5-8 * * page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 9 * * page 47, lines 10,11 * * claim - *;
 [A]US4912112  (SEYDEL JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 1, lines 1-27 * * column 4, lines 41-52; example 18 * * claims 19-21 *;
 [A]WO0128537  (ARROW THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 31, paragraph L - page 32, paragraph L * * examples 289,290; claims 1,7,9,10,15,32,35 *