Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2002220

EP2002220 - ELECTRO-OPTICAL OUTPUT UNIT AND MEASURING DEVICE COMPRISING SAID ELECTRO-OPTICAL OUTPUT UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.10.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2008/51]
Inventor(s)01 / TIEDE, Steffen
Roemerweg 16
71083 Herrenberg / DE
02 / LUKAS, Heiner
Rotenwaldstr. 21
70197 Stuttgart / DE
03 / ADAMCZAK, Wolfgang
Albstr. 35 B
70597 Stuttgart / DE
 [2008/51]
Application number, filing date07704531.812.02.2007
[2008/51]
WO2007EP51354
Priority number, dateDE2006101369524.03.2006         Original published format: DE102006013695
[2008/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007110269
Date:04.10.2007
Language:DE
[2007/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2002220
Date:17.12.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007
[2008/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01D7/00, G01B11/02, G01C3/08, G01S17/08
[2008/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/51]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRO-OPTISCHE AUSGABEEINHEIT SOWIE MESSGERÄT MIT EINER ELEKTRO-OPTISCHEN AUSGABEEINHEIT[2008/51]
English:ELECTRO-OPTICAL OUTPUT UNIT AND MEASURING DEVICE COMPRISING SAID ELECTRO-OPTICAL OUTPUT UNIT[2008/51]
French:UNITÉ DE SORTIE OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE ET APPAREIL DE MESURE MUNI D'UNE UNITÉ DE SORTIE OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE[2008/51]
Entry into regional phase24.10.2008National basic fee paid 
24.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
24.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.10.2008Examination requested  [2008/51]
26.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.10.2016
06.10.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination14.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0841/17
01.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.01.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
02.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2004113816  (MARIVENT CORP.) [X] 1-4,6-10,15 * abstract * [Y] 1-15;
 [XY]US6412187  (SASAKI KOJI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6-9,11,15 * abstract * [Y] 1-15;
 [XY]DE19539522  (PLANUNGSBUERO GREINECKER [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-9,15 * column 2, lines 14-18 * * column 3, lines 11-16 * * column 5, lines 20-45 * [Y] 1-15;
 [Y]EP0157135  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [YD]EP1566658  (LEICA GEOSYSTEMS AG [CH]) [YD] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [YD]DE10205000  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 1,9,11 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US3893028  (FEBVRE PAUL F ET AL) [Y] 5 * abstract *;
 [PX]DE102004041119  (KROEPLIN GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,9 * abstract *