Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026771

EP2026771 - MICROSPHERES COMPRISING NANOCAPSULES CONTAINING A LIPOPHILIC DRUG [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2010
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YISSUM RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSALEM
Hi Tech Park, Edmond Safra Campus Givat Ram
Jerusalem 91390 / IL
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / BENITA, Shimon
33/3 Haarazim Street
90805 Mevasseret Zion / IL
02 / ROM, Alona
22 Oren Street
76804 Mazkeret Batiya / IL
03 / NASSER, Taher
16950
Tur'an Village / IL
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Fleuchaus, Michael A. , et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Steinerstrasse 15/A
81369 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Fleuchaus, Michael A. , et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date07706027.523.01.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007IL00084
Priority number, dateUS20060760935P23.01.2006         Original published format: US 760935 P
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007083316
Date:26.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026771
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026771
Date:21.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/51, A61K9/62, A61K31/436, A61K31/4523, A61K31/7048
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MIKROKÜGELCHEN MIT NANOKAPSELN, DIE EIN LIPOPHILES ARZNEIMITTEL ENTHALTEN[2009/09]
English:MICROSPHERES COMPRISING NANOCAPSULES CONTAINING A LIPOPHILIC DRUG[2009/09]
French:MICROSPHÈRE COMPRENANT DES NANOCAPSULES CONTENANT UNE SUBSTANCE ACTIVE LIPOPHILE[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2008National basic fee paid 
22.08.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.08.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
23.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2009Fee for grant paid
22.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.07.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
CY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
IT21.10.2009
LT21.10.2009
LV21.10.2009
NL21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
TR21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
IE23.01.2010
LU23.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
IS21.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
HU22.04.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
CY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
IT21.10.2009
LT21.10.2009
LV21.10.2009
NL21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
IE23.01.2010
LU23.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
IS21.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
HU22.04.2010
Former [2012/43]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
CY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
IT21.10.2009
LT21.10.2009
LV21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
IE23.01.2010
LU23.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
IS21.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
HU22.04.2010
Former [2012/42]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
CY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
IT21.10.2009
LT21.10.2009
LV21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
IE23.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
IS21.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
HU22.04.2010
Former [2011/25]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
CY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
IT21.10.2009
LT21.10.2009
LV21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
GR22.01.2010
IE23.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
IS21.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
Former [2010/43]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
CY21.10.2009
CZ21.10.2009
DK21.10.2009
EE21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
LT21.10.2009
LV21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
RO21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
SK21.10.2009
BG21.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
ES01.02.2010
IS21.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
Former [2010/29]AT21.10.2009
BE21.10.2009
CY21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
LT21.10.2009
LV21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
ES01.02.2010
IS21.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
Former [2010/27]CY21.10.2009
FI21.10.2009
LT21.10.2009
LV21.10.2009
PL21.10.2009
SE21.10.2009
SI21.10.2009
ES01.02.2010
IS21.02.2010
PT22.02.2010
Former [2010/19]ES01.02.2010
Cited inInternational search[A]US2004109894  (SHEFER ADI [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * column W * * examples 1,2; claims 1-10,71 *;
 [A]US6589562  (SHEFER ADI [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * column W * * examples 1-3; claims 1-7,26 *
 [A]  - NISHIOKA Y ET AL, "Lymphatic targeting with nanoparticulate system.", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS 23 MAR 2001, (20010323), vol. 47, no. 1, ISSN 0169-409X, pages 55 - 64, XP002452038 [A] 1-48 * abstract * * the whole document * * pages 58-59 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-409X(00)00121-6
 [A]  - SCHAFFAZICK, POHLMANN, MEZZALIRA, GUTERRES, "Development of Nanocapsules Spray-Dried Powders Containing Melatonin", JURNAL OF THE BRAZILIAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2006), vol. 17, no. 3, pages 562 - 569, XP009089797 [A] 1-48 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 563, column 2, paragraph L - page 564, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 564, column 2, paragraph 1 *
 [AD]  - FESSI H ET AL, "NANOCAPSULE FORMATION BY INTERFACIAL POLYMER DEPOSITION FOLLOWING SOLVENT DISPLACEMENT", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19891001), vol. 55, no. 1, ISSN 0378-5173, pages R01 - R04, XP001080379 [AD] 1-48 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(89)90281-0