Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1986219

EP1986219 - SOI SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SOI SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.07.2012
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.08.2012  [2012/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
6-1 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / AKIYAMA, Shoji
c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. Advanced Functional Materials Research Center 2-13-1, Isobe
Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0195 / JP
02 / KUBOTA, Yoshihiro
c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. Advanced Functional Materials Research Center 2-13-1, Isobe
Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0195 / JP
03 / ITO, Atsuo
c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. Advanced Functional Materials Research Center 2-13-1, Isobe
Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0195 / JP
04 / TANAKA, Koichi
c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. Advanced Functional Materials Research Center 2-13-1, Isobe
Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0195 / JP
05 / KAWAI, Makoto
c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. Advanced Functional Materials Research Center 2-13-1, Isobe
Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0195 / JP
06 / TOBISAKA, Yuuji
c/o Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. Advanced Functional Materials Research Center 2-13-1, Isobe
Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0195 / JP
 [2008/44]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date07708229.508.02.2007
[2008/44]
WO2007JP52236
Priority number, dateJP2006003777115.02.2006         Original published format: JP 2006037771
[2008/44]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007094233
Date:23.08.2007
Language:JA
[2007/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1986219
Date:29.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.08.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/02, H01L21/336, H01L27/12, H01L29/786
[2008/44]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR [2008/47]
Former [2008/44]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:SOI-SUBSTRAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SOI-SUBSTRATS[2008/44]
English:SOI SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SOI SUBSTRATE[2008/44]
French:SUBSTRAT SOI ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN SUBSTRAT SOI[2008/44]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2008Translation filed 
17.07.2008National basic fee paid 
17.07.2008Search fee paid 
17.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/44]
16.09.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.10.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
18.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/35]
04.04.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/35]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.08.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1548834  (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-9 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1A-1F * [I] 4,10;
 [I]US2004161904  (BERNE CECILE [FR] ET AL) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0072]; figures 1,2,6,7 *;
 [I]US2002070454  (YASUKAWA MASAHIRO [JP]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0142] - paragraph [0175]; figures 1-4d *
International search[Y]JP2005158935  ;
 [Y]JP2005142524