Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021537

EP2021537 - SPANDEX FIBERS CONTAINING PARTIALLY DEHYDROXYLATED HYDROTALCITE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.2011
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hyosung Corporation
450 Kongduk-dong
Mapo-gu
Seoul 121-020 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Hyosung Corporation
450 Kongduk-dong, Mapo-gu
Seoul 121-020 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / SONG, Byung Su
202-ho, 787-10, Bono-2-dong, Sangrok-gu
Ansan-si, Gyeonggi-do 426-182 / KR
02 / SEO, Seung Won
Baekdu Hanyang Apt. 991-2102, Sanbon-dong
Gunpo-si, Gyeonggi-do 435-040 / KR
03 / YOO, Byung Ha
3/1, 913-2, Hogye-dong, Dongan-gu
Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date07708702.101.02.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007KR00551
Priority number, dateKR2006004140709.05.2006         Original published format: KR 20060041407
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007129807
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2021537
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2021537
Date:24.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR15.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:D01F6/70, D01F1/10
[2009/50]
Former International [2009/07]D01F6/70
Designated contracting statesIT,   TR [2009/23]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELASTHANFASERN MIT PARTIELL DEHYDROXYLIERTEM HYDROTALCIT[2009/07]
English:SPANDEX FIBERS CONTAINING PARTIALLY DEHYDROXYLATED HYDROTALCITE[2009/07]
French:FIBRES SPANDEX CONTENANT DE L'HYDROTALCITE PARTIELLEMENT DÉSHYDROXYLÉE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2008National basic fee paid 
04.12.2008Search fee paid 
04.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
10.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.01.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK
05.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.2010Fee for grant paid
16.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.08.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DX]WO2006006784  (HYOSUNG CORP [KR], et al) [DX] 1-8 * paragraphs [0057] - [0059]; examples 1-4; claim 6 *;
 [DX]EP1262499  (FILLATTICE S P A [IT]) [DX] 1-8 * paragraphs [0016] , [0018] , [0046] - [0052] *
International search[A]JPH11229272  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND);
 [A]JP2000290836  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND);
 [A]KR20060005814  (HYOSUNG CORP [KR]);
 [A]KR100437988B
by applicantKR20060005814
    - STANIMIROVA ET AL., CLAY MINERALS, (2004), vol. 39, pages 177 - 191,