Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1980141

EP1980141 - FABRICATION METHOD FOR ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE AND ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE FABRICATED BY THE SAME METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.07.2014
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2016Petition for review: decisionpublished on 16.11.2016  [2016/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Chem, Ltd.
20, Yoido-dong
Youngdungpo-gu, Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2008/42]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Jung-Hyoung
1502, Anusvill, 1380-1, Dunsan-dong, Seo-gu
Daejeon Metropolitan City, 302-120 / KR
02 / KIM, Jung-Bum
1133, Anusvill, Dunsan-dong, Seo-gu
Daejeon Metropolitan City, 302-120 / KR
03 / HAHM, Yun-Hye
403-1502, Yeolmae Maeul 4-danji Jijok-dong, Yuseong-gu
Daejeon Metropolitan City, 305-770 / KR
 [2008/49]
Former [2008/42]01 / LEE, Jung-Hyoung
1502, Anusvill, 1380-1, Dunsan-dong, Seo-gu
Daejeon Metropolitan City, 302-120 / KR
02 / KIM, Jung-Bum
1133, Anusvill, Dunsan-dong, Seo-gu
Daejeon Metropolitan City, 302-120 / KR
03 / HAHM, Yun-Hye
403-1502, Yeolmae Maeul 4-danji Jijok-dong, Yuseong-gu
Daejeon Metropolitan City, 305-770 / KR
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Cabinet Plasseraud
52 rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date07708721.102.02.2007
[2008/42]
WO2007KR00570
Priority number, dateKR2006001072203.02.2006         Original published format: KR 20060010722
US20060782288P15.03.2006         Original published format: US 782288 P
[2008/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007089117
Date:09.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1980141
Date:15.10.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2007
[2008/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR09.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/26
[2008/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/42]
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE ORGANISCHE LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG UND AUF DIESE WEISE HERGESTELLTE ORGANISCHE LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG[2008/42]
English:FABRICATION METHOD FOR ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE AND ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE FABRICATED BY THE SAME METHOD[2008/42]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE FABRIQUÉ SELON LEDIT PROCÉDÉ[2008/42]
Entry into regional phase16.07.2008National basic fee paid 
16.07.2008Search fee paid 
16.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/42]
deletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/27]
01.09.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/34]
07.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/34]
Appeal following examination26.10.2012Appeal received No.  J0001/13
21.12.2012Statement of grounds filed
27.11.2013Result of appeal procedure: rejection of appeal
27.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
03.12.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Petition(s) for review:22.07.2014Petition for review received
 Number:  R0012/14
 for appeal No.  J0001/13-3101
 Petitioner:  APPR
07.10.2016Decision:  Rejection of petition for review.
07.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
Request for re-establishment of rights:02.04.2010Date of receipt
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200903   M06   Not yet paid
28.02.201105   M06   Not yet paid
29.02.201206   M06   Not yet paid
28.02.201307   M06   Not yet paid
28.02.201408   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US6946319  (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]);
 [Y]US2005208330  (EASTMAN KODAK CO);
 [Y]US2004245919  (KIM KYUNG MAN [KR]);
 [A]US2005123793  (THOMPSON MARK E [US], et al)