Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024877

EP2024877 - EFFICIENT DATABASE LOOKUP OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 16.08.2017  [2017/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/12]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COX, Shaun David
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date07709834.125.01.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US01978
Priority number, dateUS2006041323128.04.2006         Original published format: US 413231
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007130175
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024877
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR15.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, H04L12/58
[2010/01]
Former International [2009/08]G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:EFFIZIENTE DATENBANK-NACHSCHLAGEOPERATIONEN[2009/08]
English:EFFICIENT DATABASE LOOKUP OPERATIONS[2009/08]
French:OPERATIONS EFFICACES DE CONSULTATION DE BASES DE DONNEES[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2008National basic fee paid 
26.11.2008Search fee paid 
26.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
29.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/33]
02.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
27.03.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/33]
27.03.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.01.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
08.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
08.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
08.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[A]US2006064473  (BORELLA MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraphs [0012] , [0023] , [0024] , [0030] , [0031] *;
 [A]US2005165880  (MOODY PAUL B [US], et al) [A] * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006]; figure -; claim - * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0062] *;
 [A]US2005216595  (MIYATA TATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0062]; figures 2,12; claim - *;
 [A]  - ACHARYA A ET AL, "Unleashing the Power of Wearable Devices in a SIP Infrastructure", PERVASIVE COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS, 2005. PERCOM 2005. THIRD IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON KAUAI ISLAND, HI, USA 08-12 MARCH 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050308), ISBN 978-0-7695-2299-9, pages 159 - 168, XP010779650 [A] * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PERCOM.2005.51
International search[A]US6487548  (LEYMANN FRANK [DE], et al);
 [A]US2004039742  (BARSNESS ERIC L [US], et al);
 [A]US2005021525  (THUERINGER PETER [AT], et al)
by applicantUS2006064473
 US2005165880
 US2005216595