Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1977036

EP1977036 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR FEEDING CHEMICALS INTO A PROCESS STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.08.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2016Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nalco Company
1601 West Diehl Road
Naperville, IL 60563-1198 / US
[2013/39]
Former [2008/41]For all designated states
Nalco Company
1601 West Diehl Road
Naperville, IL 60563-1198 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JACOBSON, Tommy
Vironkatu 5 A10
FIN-00170 Helsinki / FI
02 / SALONEN, Mika
Pihlajaniityntie 3 J
FI-02940 Espoo / FI
03 / LATVA, Martti
Rehtsuontie 25
FI-21290 Rusko / FI
 [2008/41]
Representative(s)Godemeyer Blum Lenze Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB - werkpatent
An den Gärten 7
51491 Overath / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/22]Godemeyer Blum Lenze - werkpatent
An den Gärten 7
51491 Overath / DE
Former [2013/01]Polypatent
Postfach 11 07
51482 Overath / DE
Former [2012/49]Lenze, Norman , et al
Fleischer, Godemeyer, Kierdorf
& Partner, Patentanwälte
polypatent
An den Gärten 7
DE-51491 Overath / DE
Former [2012/43]Fleischer, Holm Herbert , et al
Polypatent
An den Gärten 7
51491 Overath / DE
Former [2011/03]Giovannini, Francesca , et al
Osha Liang 32, avenue de l'Opéra
75002 Paris / FR
Former [2008/41]Maggs, Michael Norman , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date07709869.724.01.2007
[2008/41]
WO2007US02060
Priority number, dateUS2006033916925.01.2006         Original published format: US 339169
[2008/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007087408
Date:02.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1977036
Date:08.10.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007
[2008/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1977036
Date:25.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.01.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:D21F1/02, D21H23/10, D21H23/20, B01F5/00, B01F5/04, B01J4/00, D21G9/00
[2012/11]
Former International [2008/41]D21C9/00, D21C11/06, D21B1/36
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/41]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG FÜR DIE ZUFÜHRUNG VON CHEMIKALIEN IN EINEN PROZESSSTROM[2008/41]
English:METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR FEEDING CHEMICALS INTO A PROCESS STREAM[2008/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'INTRODUCTION DE PRODUITS CHIMIQUES DANS UN FLUX DE TRAITEMENT[2008/41]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2008National basic fee paid 
11.07.2008Search fee paid 
11.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/41]
21.08.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2013Fee for grant paid
10.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.05.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.06.2014  25.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel Chemicals International B.V.
Stationsstraat 77
3811 MH Amersfoort / NL
Opponent's representative
Kreller-Schober, Maria, et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
 [2015/48]
Former [2014/31]
Opponent(s)01  19.06.2014  25.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel Chemicals International B.V.
Stationsstraat 77
3811 MH Amersfoort / NL
Opponent's representative
Van Deursen, Petrus Hubertus, et al
Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department Velperweg 76
6824 BM Amhem / NL
30.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
28.04.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition05.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1570/16
08.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
05.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1570/16
07.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.01.2007
BE25.09.2013
BG25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
TR25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
IE24.01.2014
LU24.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU24.01.2007
BE25.09.2013
BG25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
IE24.01.2014
LU24.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
Former [2016/25]BE25.09.2013
BG25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
IE24.01.2014
LU24.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
Former [2015/07]BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
IE24.01.2014
LU24.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
Former [2014/41]BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
LU24.01.2014
IS25.01.2014
Former [2014/38]BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
IS25.01.2014
Former [2014/26]BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
IS25.01.2014
Former [2014/24]BE25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
IS25.01.2014
Former [2014/23]BE25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
IS25.01.2014
Former [2014/22]BE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
Former [2014/18]BE25.09.2013
LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
Former [2014/12]LT25.09.2013
LV25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT25.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9943887  (AHLSTROM MACHINERY OY [FI]; MATULA JOUNI [FI]) [A] 1-24 * figures 2,3,9,11 * * page 14, line 4 - line 16 * * claims 20-53 * * page 14, line 24 - page 15, line 3 *;
 [A]EP0161844  (BETZ EUROP INC [US]) [A] 1-24 * page 32, line 1 - page 33, line 4 *;
 [A]US2004091406  (WOLFERT ANDREAS [DE] ET AL WOELFERT ANDREAS [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-24 * claims 1-17 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9826862  (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]; WALLTHER BO [SE]) [A] 1-24 * figure 1 * * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]EP0127991  (SPIRO INVESTMENT SA [CH]) [A] 1-24 * figure 2 *
International search[X]US2004222239  ;
 [X]US3428520  ;
 [Y]US2004040679  ;
 [Y]US2004055869