blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2019479

EP2019479 - A SINGLE-DESK POWER SUPPLY AND A METHOD FOR PROVIDING A POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.07.2021Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 11.08.2021  [2021/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2018/27]
Former [2009/05]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Chengyong
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / ZHANG, Liyuan
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2018/27]
Former [2009/05]01 / LI, Chengyong
Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / ZHANG, Liyuan
Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
Representative(s)Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al
Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH
Riesstraße 25
80992 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/27]Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al
Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH
Riesstrasse 8
80992 München / DE
Former [2012/36]Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al
Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Dessauerstrasse 3
80992 München / DE
Former [2009/05]Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al
Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date07711077.312.03.2007
[2009/05]
WO2007CN00789
Priority number, dateCN2006108102519.05.2006         Original published format: CN200610081025
[2009/05]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2007134510
Date:29.11.2007
Language:ZH
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2019479
Date:28.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2019479
Date:04.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN29.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2011
ClassificationIPC:H02M3/00
[2009/05]
CPC:
H02M3/00 (EP,US); G06F1/08 (EP,US); H02J1/08 (US);
H02J1/082 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/27]
Former [2009/05]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINTISCH-STROMVERSORGUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER STROMVERSORGUNG[2009/05]
English:A SINGLE-DESK POWER SUPPLY AND A METHOD FOR PROVIDING A POWER SUPPLY[2009/05]
French:ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE PAR ORDINATEUR DE BUREAU UNIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE[2009/05]
Entry into regional phase25.09.2008Translation filed 
25.09.2008National basic fee paid 
25.09.2008Search fee paid 
25.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
25.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.2008Examination requested  [2009/05]
14.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
22.05.2018Fee for grant paid
22.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP18170972.6  / EP3487054
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.05.2013
Opposition(s)05.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
09.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
02.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.03.2007
AT04.07.2018
CY04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
TR04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
PT05.11.2018
IE12.03.2019
LU12.03.2019
MT12.03.2019
CH31.03.2019
LI31.03.2019
[2021/32]
Former [2021/26]AT04.07.2018
CY04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
TR04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
PT05.11.2018
IE12.03.2019
LU12.03.2019
MT12.03.2019
CH31.03.2019
LI31.03.2019
Former [2020/29]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
TR04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
PT05.11.2018
IE12.03.2019
LU12.03.2019
MT12.03.2019
CH31.03.2019
LI31.03.2019
Former [2020/16]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
TR04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
IE12.03.2019
LU12.03.2019
CH31.03.2019
LI31.03.2019
Former [2020/11]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
IE12.03.2019
LU12.03.2019
CH31.03.2019
LI31.03.2019
Former [2020/09]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
IE12.03.2019
LU12.03.2019
Former [2020/01]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
LU12.03.2019
Former [2019/46]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
MC04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/37]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SI04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/26]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/24]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT04.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002118001  (DUFFY THOMAS P [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025]; figures 2,4 *;
 [XI]US2004130302  (OSTOJIC PREDRAG [CA]) [X] 1,4-8,11,12,14,15,17 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0028]; figure 2 * [I] 2,3,9,10,13,16;
 [A]US2005289373  (CHAPUIS ALAIN [US], et al) [A] 1-17* abstract *
International search[A]US5631546  (HEINKE FRIEDHELM [DE]);
 [Y]CN2639935Y  (SHANGHAI ANFU LASER ELECTRONIC [CN]);
 [X]CN2655309Y  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN])
by applicantUS2002118001
 US2004130302
 US2005289373
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.