Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1981340

EP1981340 - COMBINATIONS OF 4-BROMO-2-(4-CHLOROPHENYL)-5-(TRIFLUOROMETHYL)-1H-PYRROLE-3-CARBONITRILE AND METAL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.06.2012
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2019Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V.
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
[2012/30]
Former [2008/43]For all designated states
Janssen Pharmaceutica, N.V.
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
Inventor(s)01 / KEMPEN, Tony Mathilde Jozef
Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V.
Turnhoutseweg 30
B-2340 Beerse / BE
 [2012/30]
Former [2008/43]01 / KEMPEN, Tony Mathilde Jozef
Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30
B-2340 Beerse / BE
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2012/30]Verberckmoes, Filip Gerard , et al
Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V.
J&J Patent Law Department
Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
Former [2008/43]Verberckmoes, Filip Gerard , et al
Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., J&J Patent Law Department, Turnhoutseweg 30
2340 Beerse / BE
Application number, filing date07712141.631.01.2007
[2008/43]
WO2007EP50927
Priority number, dateEP2006010112401.02.2006         Original published format: EP 06101124
[2008/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007088172
Date:09.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1981340
Date:22.10.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2007
[2008/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1981340
Date:25.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:A01N43/36, A01N59/16, A01P9/00, A01P13/00, C09D5/16, B27K3/52, C02F1/50
[2012/13]
Former International [2008/43]A01N43/36, A01N59/20, A01N59/16, A01P9/00, A01P13/00, C09D5/16, B27K3/52, C02F1/50
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/43]
Extension statesAL01.09.2008
BA01.09.2008
HR01.09.2008
MK01.09.2008
RS01.09.2008
TitleGerman:KOMBINATIONEN AUS 4-BROM-2-(4-CHLOROPHENYL)-5-(TRIFLUOROMETHYL)-1H-PYRROL-3-CARBONITRIL UND METALLVERBINDUNGEN[2008/43]
English:COMBINATIONS OF 4-BROMO-2-(4-CHLOROPHENYL)-5-(TRIFLUOROMETHYL)-1H-PYRROLE-3-CARBONITRILE AND METAL COMPOUNDS[2008/43]
French:COMBINAISONS DE 4-BROMO-2-(4-CHLOROPHENYL)-5-(TRIFLUOROMETHYL)-1H-PYRROLE-3-CARBONITRILE ET DE COMPOSES METALLIQUES[2008/43]
Entry into regional phase01.09.2008National basic fee paid 
01.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/43]
15.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.06.2012Fee for grant paid
05.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11166915.6  / EP2361504
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.06.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.04.2013  25.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V.
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Akzo Nobel IP Department, et al
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
 [2017/41]
Former [2013/24]
Opponent(s)01  24.04.2013   
Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V.
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Sahans, Sarah Anne, et al
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Legal, IP & Compliance
Velperweg 76
6800 SB Arnhem / NL
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
28.06.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.01.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
27.01.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.01.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition24.03.2015Appeal received No.  T0608/15
26.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.01.2007
AT25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
RO25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
SK25.07.2012
BG25.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
CH31.01.2013
IE31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
LU31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/07]AT25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
RO25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
SK25.07.2012
BG25.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
CH31.01.2013
IE31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/48]AT25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
RO25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
SK25.07.2012
BG25.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/37]AT25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
RO25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
SK25.07.2012
BG25.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/34]AT25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
RO25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
SK25.07.2012
BG25.10.2012
IS25.11.2012
Former [2013/23]AT25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
RO25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
SK25.07.2012
IS25.11.2012
Former [2013/22]AT25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
CZ25.07.2012
EE25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
IS25.11.2012
Former [2013/11]AT25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
LV25.07.2012
SI25.07.2012
IS25.11.2012
Former [2013/10]AT25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
IS25.11.2012
Former [2013/08]AT25.07.2012
LT25.07.2012
Former [2013/07]AT25.07.2012
Cited inInternational search[ADX]WO03039256  (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document * * page 14, line 7 - page 15 * [X] 1,8,13-19;
 [X]WO2005075581  (AKZO NOBEL COATINGS INT BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,8,12-17,19 * page 1, line 4 - line 19 * * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 5 * * page 14, line 1- page 15, line 6, in particular page 14, last line - page 15, first line *;; example 7 *;
 [X]EP0831134  (SIGMA COATINGS BV [NL]) [X] 1,8,13,15-17,19 * page 2, line 3 - line 36 * * page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 17 * * page 4, line 40 - line 47 * * example - *