Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2027239

EP2027239 - DETERGENT AND BLEACH COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.01.2014
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.02.2014  [2014/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
The Procter and Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BROOKER, Anju Deepali Massey
3 Flaxby Close
Gosforth Newcastle Upon Tyne NE3 FLP / GB
02 / BROOKER, Alan Thomas
5 Flaxby Close
Gosforth Newcastle Upon Tyne NE3 5LP / GB
03 / ELLIS, Julie
10 Etherstone Avenue
High Heaton Newcastle Upon Tyne NE7 7JX / GB
04 / LETZELTER, Nathalie, Sophie
The Old Farmhouse Brunton Bridge Farm Brunton Lane
Newcastle Upon Tyne NE13 7AL / GB
05 / NELSON, Andrew Paul
3 Chipchase Mews Newcastle Great Park
Gosforth Newcastle Upon Tyne NE3 5RH / GB
06 / ROBLES, Eric, San Jose
32 West Mount
Killingworth Newcastle Upon Tyne NE12 6FR / GB
07 / SOMERVILLE ROBERTS, Nigel, Patrick
3 The Cloggs, Ponteland
Newcastle Upon Tyne NE20 9UJ / GB
08 / SONG, Xinbei
8670 Kenwood Road
Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Yorquez Ramirez, Maria Isabel , et al
Patent Department
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/52]Yorquez Ramirez, Maria Isabel , et al
Patent Department Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2010/47]Niemann, Frédéric , et al
Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2009/09]Yorquez Ramirez, Maria Isabel
Patent Department Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Application number, filing date07713222.307.03.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007IB50763
Priority number, dateUS2006044147826.05.2006         Original published format: US 441478
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007138491
Date:06.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2027239
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/39, C11D3/22, C11D3/37
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:WASCH- UND BLEICHMITTEL[2009/09]
English:DETERGENT AND BLEACH COMPOSITIONS[2009/09]
French:COMPOSITIONS DÉTERGENTES ET BLANCHISSANTES[2013/14]
Former [2009/09]COMPOSITIONS DE DÉTERGENT ET DE JAVELLISANT
Entry into regional phase23.10.2008National basic fee paid 
23.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
12.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/07]
17.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/07]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.07.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
07.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
08.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]US3167513  (EMBDEN JAN CIRKSENA MEERKAMP V, et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1 - column 2 * * column 3, line 20 *;
 [XD]WO9519132  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [XD] 1-10 * page 40; examples 1,2; claim - *;
 [DX]WO9307086  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DX] 1-10 * page 31 - page 36; examples 4-6; claim - *;
 [A]WO9811189  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 25 - page 26; example -; claim - *;
 [A]US5827808  (APPLEBY CLAIRE [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim - *;
 [A]GB1002893  (HENKEL & CIE GMBH) [A] 1-10 * example 4; claim - *;
 [PX]EP1700906  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PX] 1,3-5,8,9 * example - *