blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1988630

EP1988630 - ELASTIC SURFACE WAVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.02.2013
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.02.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.03.2013  [2013/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd.
10-1 Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP
[2008/45]
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAI, Yasuharu
c/o MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
02 / NISHIYAMA, Kenji
c/o MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
03 / NAKAO, Takeshi
c/o MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
04 / KATO, Masanori
c/o MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
05 / KADOTA, Michio
c/o MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
 [2008/45]
Representative(s)Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date07713846.906.02.2007
[2008/45]
WO2007JP52017
Priority number, dateJP2006004282220.02.2006         Original published format: JP 2006042822
[2008/45]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2007097186
Date:30.08.2007
Language:JA
[2007/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1988630
Date:05.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.08.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2010
ClassificationIPC:H03H9/25
[2008/45]
CPC:
H03H9/02559 (EP,US); H03H9/0222 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/45]
TitleGerman:ELASTISCHE OBERFLÄCHENWELLENVORRICHTUNG[2008/45]
English:ELASTIC SURFACE WAVE DEVICE[2008/45]
French:DISPOSITIF A ONDES DE SURFACE ELASTIQUES[2008/45]
Entry into regional phase12.08.2008Translation filed 
12.08.2008National basic fee paid 
12.08.2008Search fee paid 
12.08.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.08.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.08.2008Examination requested  [2008/45]
31.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/11]
08.10.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/11]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.05.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.201206   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS5643817  (HITACHI LTD);
 [Y]US2003117240  (INOUE SHOGO [JP], et al);
 [X]EP1391988  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]);
 [XY]WO2005034347  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al);
 [A]WO2006016544  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al);
 US2007096592  [ ] (KADOTA MICHIO [JP], et al)
International search[Y]WO2005011117  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al);
 [X]WO2005034347  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.