Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022175

EP2022175 - COMMUNICATION TERMINAL FOR CHANGING CHANNEL AND CHANNEL CHANGING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 19.06.2019  [2019/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/39]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / HAN, Sang-Min
Samsung Advanced Institute Of
Technology, Mt. 14-1
Nongseo-dong
Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyunggi-do 449-712 / KR
02 / LEE, Seong-soo
Samsung Advanced Institute Of
Technology, Mt. 14-1
Nongseo-dong
Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyunggi-do 449-712 / KR
03 / KIM, Young-hwan
Samsung Advanced Institute Of
Technology, Mt. 14-1
Nongseo-dong
Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyunggi-do 449-712 / KR
04 / SON, Mi-hyun
Samsung Advanced Institute Of
Technology, Mt. 14-1
Nongseo-dong
Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyunggi-do 449-712 / KR
 [2019/25]
Former [2009/07]01 / HAN, Sang-Min
Samsung Advanced Institute Of Technology, Mt. 14-1 Nongseo-dong
Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyunggi-do 449-712 / KR
02 / LEE, Seong-soo
Samsung Advanced Institute Of Technology, Mt. 14-1 Nongseo-dong
Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyunggi-do 449-712 / KR
03 / KIM, Young-hwan
Samsung Advanced Institute Of Technology, Mt. 14-1 Nongseo-dong
Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyunggi-do 449-712 / KR
04 / SON, Mi-hyun
Samsung Advanced Institute Of Technology, Mt. 14-1 Nongseo-dong
Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyunggi-do 449-712 / KR
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/25]
Former [2009/07]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date07715475.507.03.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007KR01071
Priority number, dateKR2006004254211.05.2006         Original published format: KR 20060042542
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007132977
Date:22.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022175
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007
[2009/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2022175
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR22.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/40, H04B1/3827, H04M1/60, H04B17/327, H04B17/382
[2015/21]
Former International [2009/07]H04B1/40
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2019/25]
Former [2009/28]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT ZUM WECHSELN DES KANALS UND KANALWECHSELVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2009/07]
English:COMMUNICATION TERMINAL FOR CHANGING CHANNEL AND CHANNEL CHANGING METHOD THEREOF[2009/07]
French:TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION PERMETTANT DE CHANGER DE VOIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHANGEMENT DE VOIE[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2008National basic fee paid 
05.12.2008Search fee paid 
05.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
12.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.01.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
06.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2019Fee for grant paid
09.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005255878  (LEINONEN MARKO E [FI], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0066] - [0090]; figures 6-9 *;
 [XI]US2005220173  (ZYREN JAMES G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10-12 * paragraphs [0013] - [0016] - [0037] - [0041] - [0056] - [0062]; figures 6,7 * [I] 3-9,14-19
International search[Y]KR20050026041  (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]);
 [Y]KR20010011833  (CHANG YUN SEOK [KR], et al);
 [A]US6185423  (BROWN JOHN RICHARD [US], et al)