Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1996856

EP1996856 - LED MODULE FOR ILLUMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.07.2010
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.08.2010  [2010/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAE Shin Led Co. Ltd.
284-28, Eunhaeng-dong
Siheung-si, Gyeonggi-do 429-060 / KR
[2008/49]
Inventor(s)01 / YOON, Young Ro
Hangaram Apt. 207-1308 Ichon-dong Yongsan-gu
Seoul 140-030 / KR
02 / KANG, Woo Suk
Gaebong Hyundai Apt. 117-103 Gaebong-dong Guro-gu
Seoul 152-090 / KR
 [2008/49]
Representative(s)Barth, Stephan Manuel , et al
ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/49]Barth, Stephan Manuel , et al
Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date07715626.313.03.2007
[2008/49]
WO2007KR01230
Priority number, dateKR2006002471617.03.2006         Original published format: KR 20060024716
[2008/49]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007108600
Date:27.09.2007
Language:KO
[2007/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1996856
Date:03.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.09.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:F21S2/00
[2008/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LED-MODUL FÜR BELEUCHTUNG[2008/49]
English:LED MODULE FOR ILLUMINATION[2008/49]
French:MODULE DEL D'ÉCLAIRAGE[2008/49]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2007Translation filed 
10.09.2008National basic fee paid 
10.09.2008Search fee paid 
10.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/49]
28.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/32]
18.03.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201004   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2005029185  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]; NISHIMOTO KEIJI; TANIMOTO NORIYAS) [X] 1-15 * page 8, line 4 - line 28 * * page 9, line 6 - line 24 * * page 11, line 14 - line 26 * * page 13, line 1 - line 7 * * page 14, line 9 - line 20 * * page 27, line 4 - line 14 * * page 27, line 27 - page 28, line 10 * * figures 3B,4,5,10A,10B,11A.11B,18,19 *;
 [X]WO2005093862  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]; NISHIMOTO KEIJI; NAGAI HIDEO) [X] 1-13,15 * page 22, line 13 - line 21 * * page 23, line 19 - page 24, line 15 * * page 25, line 7 - line 20 * * figures 1,2,3A,12-15,17,24 *;
 [X]WO2006006544  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]; OGATA TOSHIFUMI; TANIMOTO NORIYAS) [X] 1-14 * page 11, line 4 - page 13, line 7 * * figures 2-9 *;
 [A]JP2005050827  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1,2,5-11,13 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 22 - page 5, paragraph 22 * * page 6, paragraph 36 * * page 6, paragraph 40 - page 7, paragraph 43 *;
 [A]US2005221519  (LEUNG MICHAEL [US] ET AL) [A] 1,2,6-11,13-15 * page 5, paragraph 58 - page 6, paragraph 61 * * figures 1-10,16-18 *
International search[A]US6365920  ;
 [A]US6614103  ;
 [A]US6331063