Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020070

EP2020070 - A TIME ALERT DEVICE FOR USE TOGETHER WITH AN EARTH LEAKAGE PROTECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2011
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 19.06.2013  [2013/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fong, See Ni
n° 6 Jalan Kenanga SD 9/5D, Bandar Sri Damansara
Kuala Lumpur, 52200 / MY
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Chaillot, Geneviève , et al
Cabinet Chaillot
16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre
B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/01]Chaillot, Geneviève , et al
Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
Former [2009/06]Chaillot, Geneviève , et al
Cabinet CHAILLOT, B.P. No. 74
92703 Colombes Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date07715828.526.03.2007
[2009/06]
WO2007MY00017
Priority number, dateMY2006000190726.04.2006         Original published format: MY 0601907
MY2007000023116.02.2007         Original published format: MY 0700231
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007123390
Date:01.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2020070
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007
[2009/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020070
Date:29.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:H02H3/33, G01R31/327
[2009/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/06]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZEITWARNEINRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG ZUSAMMEN MIT EINER ERDLECKSCHUTZEINRICHTUNG[2009/06]
English:A TIME ALERT DEVICE FOR USE TOGETHER WITH AN EARTH LEAKAGE PROTECTION DEVICE[2009/06]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ALARME TEMPORISÉ POUR DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ CONTRE FUITE À LA TERRE[2009/06]
Entry into regional phase21.11.2008National basic fee paid 
21.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
21.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/06]
12.07.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2010Fee for grant paid
10.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.09.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
MT29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
LU26.03.2011
BG29.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
IS29.04.2011
[2013/25]
Former [2012/05]CY29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
MT29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
IS29.04.2011
Former [2011/49]CY29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
IS29.04.2011
Former [2011/38]CY29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
IS29.04.2011
Former [2011/29]CY29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0665623  (HAGER ELECTRO [FR]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 54; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US2004174173  (ELMS ROBERT T [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0018] , [0043] , [0048]; figures 1,2a,2b,2c *;
 [A]GB2118310  (AVO LIMITED) [A] 1 * page 2, line 29 - line 100; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2740744  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 18; figures 1,2 *