blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2099581

EP2099581 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR COATING AND SEALING INSIDE PIPING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  30.10.2020
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.07.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2020Opposition rejectedpublished on 02.12.2020  [2020/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pipe Restoration Technologies, LLC
10785 W. Twain Avenue, Suite 201
Las Vegas, NV 89135 / US
[2019/46]
Former [2019/44]For all designated states
Pipe Restoration Technologies, LLC
10785 W. Twain Avenue, Suite 102
Las Vegas, NV 89135 / US
Former [2013/34]For all designated states
Pipe Restoration Technologies, LLC
7477 W. Lake Mead Boulevard
Suite 170
Las Vegas, NV 89128 / US
Former [2009/38]For all designated states
Pipe Restoration Technologies, Inc.
7469 West Lake Mead Boulevard, Suite 200
Las Vegas, NV 89128 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GILLANDERS, Larry
45923 Berkeley Avenue
Chilliwack, BC V2P 3M8 / CA
02 / WILLIAMS, Steve
2211 Navy Drive
Stockton, CA 95206-1144 / US
03 / LABORDE, John
1613 Roanoke Street
Placentia, CA 95870-4847 / US
 [2009/38]
Representative(s)MacLachlan & Donaldson
Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road
Citywest Business Campus
Dublin D24 C56E / IE
[N/P]
Former [2013/30]McKeown, Yvonne Mary, et al
C/o MacLachlan & Donaldson
47 Merrion Square
Dublin 2 / IE
Former [2009/38]McKeown, Yvonne Mary, et al
C/o MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date07716240.204.01.2007
[2009/38]
WO2007US00072
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2008088317
Date:24.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2099581
Date:16.09.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2099581
Date:24.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2099581
Date:28.08.2013
[2013/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.07.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2011
ClassificationIPC:F16L58/10, F16L55/164
[2013/11]
CPC:
F16L58/1027 (EP); F16L55/164 (EP); B05D7/222 (EP)
Former IPC [2011/31]B23P6/00, B22D19/10, B22D1/00, B05D7/22, F16L55/164
Former IPC [2009/38]B23P6/00, B22D19/10, B22D1/00, B05D7/22
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/38]
Extension statesAL07.07.2009
BA07.07.2009
HR07.07.2009
MK07.07.2009
RS07.07.2009
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUM BESCHICHTEN UND VERSIEGELN VON INNENROHRLEITUNGSSYSTEMEN[2009/38]
English:METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR COATING AND SEALING INSIDE PIPING SYSTEMS[2009/38]
French:PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES SERVANT À REVETIR ET A ADAPTER DE FAÇON ETANCHE DES SYSTEMES DE TUYAUTERIE INTERIEURE[2013/04]
Former [2009/38]PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES SERVANT À REVÊTIR ET À ADAPTER DE FAÇON ÉTANCHE DES SYSTÈMES DE TUYAUTERIE INTÉRIEURE
Entry into regional phase07.07.2009National basic fee paid 
07.07.2009Search fee paid 
07.07.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/38]
24.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2013Date of oral proceedings
18.02.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2013Fee for grant paid
13.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13177669.2  / EP2740564
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.03.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.04.2014    ADMISSIBLE
Ecomadrifso, S.L./Green Plumber, S.L.
Paseo de la Habana 9-11 / C/Artesiano, S/N, P-91
Polígono industrial (Margen Derecha)/
28036 Madrid/
24010 Trobajo del Camino, León / ES
Opponent's representative
Temiño Ceniceros, Ignacio
Abril Patentes y Marcas, S.L.
Calle Zurbano, 76 - 7°
28010 Madrid / ES
 [N/P]
Former [2014/21]
Opponent(s)01  11.04.2014    ADMISSIBLE
Ecomadrifso, S.L./Green Plumber, S.L.
Paseo de la Habana 9-11 / C/Artesiano, S/N, P-91
Polígono industrial (Margen Derecha)/
28036 Madrid/
24010 Trobajo del Camino, León / ES
Opponent's representative
Temino Ceniceros, Ignacio
Abril Abogados Amador de los Rios 1-1°
28010 Madrid / ES
03.06.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
31.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
31.03.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
08.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
07.06.2019Reply to a communication from the opposition division
14.05.2020Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.06.2020
09.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
16.07.2020Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
26.07.2020Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2020/49]
Appeal following opposition25.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1281/16
25.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
17.10.2017Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2017/42]
23.10.2017Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2017/43]
06.09.2018Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
06.09.2018Date of oral proceedings
18.09.2018Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
10.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
08.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201105   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2011
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.01.2007
AT24.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
TR24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
IE04.01.2014
LU04.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
NL01.02.2019
DE01.08.2019
[2019/49]
Former [2016/33]HU04.01.2007
AT24.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
TR24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
IE04.01.2014
LU04.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2016/32]HU04.01.2007
AT24.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
IE04.01.2014
LU04.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2016/25]AT24.07.2013
BG24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
IE04.01.2014
LU04.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2015/07]AT24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
IE04.01.2014
LU04.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/46]AT24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
LU04.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/41]AT24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
LU04.01.2014
Former [2014/38]AT24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
MC24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/24]AT24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
IT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/23]AT24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
CZ24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
EE24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
SK24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/22]AT24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
RO24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/21]AT24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
DK24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/18]AT24.07.2013
CY24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/12]AT24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
LV24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
SI24.07.2013
CY07.08.2013
GR25.10.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/11]AT24.07.2013
FI24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
PL24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
CY07.08.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/10]AT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
CY07.08.2013
IS24.11.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/09]AT24.07.2013
LT24.07.2013
SE24.07.2013
PT25.11.2013
Former [2014/08]LT24.07.2013
PT25.11.2013
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2004132387  (KRUSE JOERG [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,14,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1-6; claims 1-24 * [Y] 3,4,8,9 [I] 10-13;
 [YA]US5007461  (NAF WERNER [CH]) [Y] 3,4,8,9 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,5-7,10-15;
 [Y]EP0721551  (REIMELT ANDREAS [DE]) [Y] 3,4,8,9 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE4404473  (GEVI GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,4,8,9 * column 1, line 1 - column 5, line 61; claims 1-35 *;
 [A]US4454173  (KOGA MOTOYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4327132  (SHINNO KIYONORI) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0634229  (PROMOTEC AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US5950681  (REIMELT ANDREAS [DE]);
 [Y]JPH1036764  (NIPPON REINZ CO LTD)
by applicantUS5045352
 US5800629
 US5915395
 US6345632
 US4314427
 US5085016
 US3287148
 US4503613
 US4311409
 US3727412
 US2004132387
 US20050246825
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.