EP1979007 - SILVER-CONTAINING ANTIMICROBIAL ARTICLES AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURTON, Scott, A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
HOLM, David, R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2014/26] |
Former [2008/42] | 01 /
BURTON, Scott, A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
HOLM, David, R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Berryman, Natalia Grace, et al Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/01] | Berryman, Natalia Grace, et al Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/50] | Aleandri-Hachgenei, Lorraine E. 3M Deutschland GmbH, Office of Intellectual Property Counsel, Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | ||
Former [2008/42] | Aleandri-Hachgenei, Lorraine E. Office of Intellectual Property Counsel, 3M Deutschland GmbH, Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 07716466.3 | 10.01.2007 | [2008/42] | WO2007US00594 | Priority number, date | US20060331867 | 13.01.2006 Original published format: US 331867 | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007084295 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1979007 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1979007 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/18, B05D5/00, B65B55/08, A61L2/08, A61L2/238, A61L15/18 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
A01N59/16 (EP,US);
A61K33/38 (EP,US);
A61L15/18 (EP,US);
A61L15/46 (EP,US);
A61L2/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2/16 (KR);
A61L2/18 (KR);
A61L2/238 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A01N59/16, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/16, A01N25/34 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2008/42] | A61L2/18, B05D5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SILBERHALTIGE ANTIMIKROBIELLE ARTIKEL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2008/42] | English: | SILVER-CONTAINING ANTIMICROBIAL ARTICLES AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE | [2008/42] | French: | ARTICLES ANTIMICROBIENS ARGENTIFERES ET PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION | [2008/42] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 26.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2007 | AT | 25.06.2014 | BE | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | ES | 25.06.2014 | FI | 25.06.2014 | IT | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | LV | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | NL | 25.06.2014 | PL | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SE | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | TR | 25.06.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | IE | 10.01.2015 | LU | 10.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/07] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 10.01.2015 | ||
LU | 10.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 10.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 10.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 10.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 10.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005123621 (BURTON SCOTT A [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0018] - [0024] - [0036] , [0038]; claim - *; | [I]US2005124724 (BURTON SCOTT A [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0076] , [0089] , [0091] , [0092] , [0097] - [0100]; claim - *; | [I]WO0124839 (ACRYMED [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * page 22, line 27 - page 23, line 28 *; | [Y]EP0255248 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1-9 * page 3, lines 11-34; examples 24,25; claim -; table 1 *; | [Y]WO02078755 (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-9 * examples 1,2 * | International search | [A]US6669981 (PARSONS DAVID [GB], et al); | [A]US2004126433 (PARSONS DAVID [GB], et al); | [A]EP0984698 (NUCRYST PHARM CORP [CA]); | [A]US2791518 (STOKES JR THOMAS A, et al); | [A]US5770255 (BURRELL ROBERT E [CA], et al) |