EP1977415 - DRUMHEAD ASSEMBLY WITH IMPROVED REBOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rogers, Thomas P. 250 Old River Road Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US | For all designated states Gastgeb, Raymond F. 1135 Ferry Road Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | [2014/26] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Rogers Thomas P. 250 Old River Road Edgewater NJ 07020 / US | ||
For all designated states Gastgeb Raymond F. 1135 Ferry Road Doylestown PA 18901 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Blaumeier, Jörg Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2014/26] |
Former [2008/41] | Blaumeier, Jörg LINDNER I BLAUMEIER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07716848.2 | 19.01.2007 | [2008/41] | WO2007US01533 | Priority number, date | US20060335114 | 19.01.2006 Original published format: US 335114 | US20070654971 | 18.01.2007 Original published format: US 654971 | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007084718 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1977415 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1977415 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G10F1/08, G10D13/02 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
G10D13/26 (EP,US);
G10D13/03 (EP,US);
G10D13/02 (EP,US);
G10D13/14 (EP,US);
F16B2/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/41] | G10F1/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TROMMELFELLANORDNUNG MIT VERBESSERTEM ABPRALL | [2008/41] | English: | DRUMHEAD ASSEMBLY WITH IMPROVED REBOUND | [2008/41] | French: | ENSEMBLE PEAU DE TAMBOUR À REBOND AMÉLIORÉ | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 29.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14163947.6 / EP2757553 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2007 | AT | 25.06.2014 | BE | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | FI | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | LV | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | NL | 25.06.2014 | PL | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | TR | 25.06.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | LU | 19.01.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6525249 (SUENAGA YUICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 1 - line 50; figures 1-5, 11 *; | [A]JPH08202353 (NISHIKAWA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 7 * abstract *; | [A]US4244266 (HARDY BRUCE N) [A] 7 * figures 1-3 * | International search | [X]US6069307 (ROGERS THOMAS P [US]); | [X]US6586665 (LIAO PI HU [TW], et al); | [Y]US5492047 (OLIVERI IGNAZUS P [US]); | [Y]US6043419 (ARBITER IVOR DAVID [GB]); | [Y]US6784352 (SUENAGA YUICHIRO [JP]); | [Y]US4244266 (HARDY BRUCE N); | [Y]US5708045 (THOMPSON ANDREW M [US], et al) | by applicant | US6069307 | US6525246 | JPH08202353 | US4244266 |