Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1982481

EP1982481 - Method and system for improving traffic distribution across a communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/43]METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPROVING TRAFFIC DISTRIBUTION ACROSS A COMMUNICATION NETWORK
[2014/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.03.2016
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Allied Telesis Holdings K.K.
2nd TOC Building 21-11 Nishigotanda 7-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0031 / JP
[2008/43]
Inventor(s)01 / TILLMAN, Mark
c/o Allied Telesis Inc.
19800 North Creek Parkway
Suite 200
Bothell, WA 98011 / US
02 / CAMPBELL, Graeme
c/o Allied Telesis Inc.
19800 North Creek Parkway
Suite 200
Bothell, WA 98011 / US
 [2015/07]
Former [2008/43]01 / TILLMAN, Mark
c/o Allied Telesis Inc., 19800 North Creek Parkway Suite 200
Bothell, WA 98011 / US
02 / CAMPBELL, Graeme
llied Telesis Inc., 19800 North Creek Parkway Suite 200
Bothell, WA 98011 / US
Representative(s)Sevinç, Erkan
Istanbul Patent A.S.
Plaza-33, Büyükdere Cad. No: 33/16
Sisli
34381 Istanbul / TR
[N/P]
Former [2015/19]Sevinç, Erkan
Istanbul Patent & Trademark Consultancy Ltd.
Plaza-33, Büyükdere cad. No: 33/16
Sisli
34381 Istanbul / TR
Former [2008/43]Sevinç, Erkan
Istanbul Patent & Trademark Consultancy Ltd. Plaza-33, Büyükdere cad. No: 33/16 Sisli
34381 Istanbul / TR
Application number, filing date07716909.223.01.2007
[2008/43]
WO2007US01711
Priority number, dateUS20060760957P23.01.2006         Original published format: US 760957 P
[2008/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007087275
Date:02.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1982481
Date:22.10.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007
[2008/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1982481
Date:06.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/12, H04L12/701, H04L12/801, H04L12/931, H04L12/709, H04L12/891, H04L12/803, H04L12/66
[2013/21]
Former International [2008/43]H04L12/56
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/19]
Former [2008/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Verbesserung der Verkehrsverteilung über ein Kommunikationsnetz[2014/37]
English:Method and system for improving traffic distribution across a communication network[2014/37]
French:Procédé et système pour améliorer la distribution du trafic sur un réseau de communication[2014/37]
Former [2008/43]VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER VERKEHRSVERTEILUNG ÜBER EIN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ
Former [2008/43]METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPROVING TRAFFIC DISTRIBUTION ACROSS A COMMUNICATION NETWORK
Former [2008/43]PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR AMELIORER LA DISTRIBUTION DU TRAFIC SUR UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION
Entry into regional phase21.08.2008National basic fee paid 
21.08.2008Search fee paid 
21.08.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
21.08.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.2008Examination requested  [2008/43]
16.10.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2015Fee for grant paid
02.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2010
Opposition(s)09.02.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
21.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201509   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.01.2007
AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB23.01.2016
IE23.01.2016
IT23.01.2016
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
FR01.02.2016
NL01.02.2016
[2018/33]
Former [2018/28]HU23.01.2007
AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB23.01.2016
IE23.01.2016
IT23.01.2016
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
FR01.02.2016
NL01.02.2016
Former [2017/40]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB23.01.2016
IE23.01.2016
IT23.01.2016
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
FR01.02.2016
NL01.02.2016
Former [2017/13]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB23.01.2016
IE23.01.2016
IT23.01.2016
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
FR01.02.2016
NL01.02.2016
Former [2017/07]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB23.01.2016
IE23.01.2016
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
FR01.02.2016
NL01.02.2016
Former [2016/52]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB23.01.2016
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
FR01.02.2016
NL01.02.2016
Former [2016/50]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB23.01.2016
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
FR01.02.2016
Former [2016/47]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
GB23.01.2016
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
Former [2016/46]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
Former [2016/42]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
LU23.01.2016
Former [2016/39]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
LU23.01.2016
Former [2016/36]AT06.05.2015
BE06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/24]AT06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
BE31.01.2016
Former [2016/10]AT06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/09]AT06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/07]AT06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/51]AT06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
GR07.08.2015
PT07.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]US6807179  (KANURI MRUDULA [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 1, line 43 - line 55 * * column 2, line 7 - line 24 * * column 4, line 17 - column 6, line 43 *;
 [X]WO0139435  (IRONBRIDGE NETWORKS INC [US]) [X] 1-17 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 23 * * page 5, line 3 - line 7 * * page 5, line 20 - page 7, line 14 * * page 8, line 17 - page 13, line 2 *
International search[X]US2003118016  (KALKUNTE MOHAN [US], et al);
 [A]US2005220096  (FRISKNEY ROBERT [GB], et al);
 [A]US2002150091  (LOPPONEN JUSSI [FI], et al);
 [A]US2002150092  (BONTEMPI RICHARD [FI], et al)
by applicantUS6807179