Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1989619

EP1989619 - HARDWARE ACCELERATION FOR A SOFTWARE TRANSACTIONAL MEMORY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.02.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SAHA, Bratin
4301 Norwalk Drive, Apt U 206
San Jose, California 95129 / US
02 / ADL-TABATABAI, Ali-Reza
2125 Quinn Avenue
Santa Clara, California 95051 / US
03 / JACOBSON, Quinn
598 Sunnymount Ave
Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US
 [2008/46]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/17]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford & Co. 16 High Holborn London
WC1V 6BX / GB
Former [2008/46]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London
WC1V 6BX / GB
Application number, filing date07717199.906.02.2007
[2008/46]
WO2007US03112
Priority number, dateUS2006034978707.02.2006         Original published format: US 349787
[2008/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007092422
Date:16.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1989619
Date:12.11.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007
[2008/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1989619
Date:24.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/42, G06F9/52, G06F9/46
[2012/39]
Former International [2008/46]G06F9/46
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/46]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HARDWAREBESCHLEUNIGUNG FÜR EIN SPEICHERSYSTEM FÜR SOFTWARE-TRANSAKTIONEN[2008/46]
English:HARDWARE ACCELERATION FOR A SOFTWARE TRANSACTIONAL MEMORY SYSTEM[2008/46]
French:ACCELERATION MATERIELLE POUR UN SYSTEME DE MEMOIRE DE TRANSACTIONS DE LOGICIELS[2008/46]
Entry into regional phase29.07.2008National basic fee paid 
29.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/46]
27.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.01.2013Fee for grant paid
24.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12001665.4  / EP2503460
EP12006273.2  / EP2562642
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.08.2010
Opposition(s)27.01.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
16.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
17.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.02.2007
AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU06.02.2007
AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/44]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/11]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/10]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/09]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/52]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/50]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/49]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/48]AT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT24.04.2013
PT26.08.2013
Cited inInternational search[XP]  - BRATIN SAHA ET AL, "Architectural Support for Software Transactional Memory", MICROARCHITECTURE, 2006. MICRO-39. 39TH ANNUAL IEEE/ACM INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PI, (20061201), ISBN 978-0-7695-2732-1, pages 185 - 196, XP031034170 [XP] 1-48 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MOIR M, Hybrid Transactional Memory, ANNOUNCEMENT SUN MICROSYSTEMS, XX, XX, PAGE(S) 1 - 15, (20050701), XP002407375 [A] 1-48 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ROBERT ENNALS, Efficient Software Transactional Memory, INTEL CORPORATION, (2003), XP002492783 [A] 1-48 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SHAVIT N ET AL, "SOFTWARE TRANSACTIONAL MEMORY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL ACM SYMPOSIUM ON PRINCIPLES OF DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING. OTTAWA, AUG. 20 - 23, 1995; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL ACM SYMPOSIUM ON PRINCIPLES OF DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING.(PODC)], NEW YORK, ACM, US, (19950820), vol. SYMP. 14, ISBN 978-0-89791-710-0, pages 204 - 213, XP000643146 [A] 1-48 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/224964.224987
 [A]  - HERLIHY M ET AL, "Transactional Memory: Architectural Support For Lock-free Data Structures", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE. SAN DIEGO, MAY 16 - 19, 1993; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE], LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE. COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19930516), vol. SYMP. 20, ISBN 978-0-8186-3810-7, pages 289 - 300, XP010095799 [A] 1-48 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/165123.165164