Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2021469

EP2021469 - PEPTIDE LIBRARY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.03.2010
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.04.2010  [2010/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universität für Bodenkultur Wien
Gregor Mendel-Strasse 33
1180 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Universität für Bodenkultur Wien
Gregor Mendel-Strasse 33
1180 Vienna / AT
Inventor(s)01 / JUNGBAUER, Alois
Ichagasse 31-1
A-1210 Vienna / AT
02 / MERSICH, Christa
Fasangasse 39-41/4/7
A-1030 Vienna / AT
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date07718365.529.03.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007AT00148
Priority number, dateAT2006000053329.03.2006         Original published format: AT 5332006
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007109823
Date:04.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2021469
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/10, C12N5/00, C07K1/00, G01N33/68, A61K38/00, A61K39/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PEPTIDBIBLIOTHEK[2009/07]
English:PEPTIDE LIBRARY[2009/07]
French:BIBLIOTHÉQUE DE PEPTIDES[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase22.09.2008National basic fee paid 
22.09.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.09.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
31.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/14]
17.11.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0020574  (RIGEL PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,9-15 * page 42, lines 28-30 * * page 42, line 37 - page 43, line 1 * * page 50, line 29 - page 51, line 18 * * claim 2 *;
 [X]US6107059  (HART CHARLES P [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,9-15 * column 3, line 14 - line 48 * * column 4, line 61 - line 63 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP1236738  (JUNGBAUER ALOIS PROFESSOR DR [AT]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [DA]  - SCHUSTER M ET AL, "PROTEIN EXPRESSION STRATEGIES FOR IDENTIFICATION OF NOVEL TARGET PROTEINS", JOURNAL OF BIOMOLECULAR SCREENING, LARCHMONT, NY, US, (200004), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 1087-0571, pages 89 - 97, XP008010011 [DA] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/108705710000500205
 [DA]  - SCHUSTER M ET AL, "Protein expression in yeast", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (2000), vol. 84, no. 3, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 237 - 248, XP002252806 [DA] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1656(00)00355-2
 [T]  - MERSICH CHRISTA ET AL, "Identification of a ligand for IgG-Fc derived from a soluble peptide library based on fusion proteins secreted by S. cerevisiae.", BIOTECHNOLOGY JOURNAL JUN 2007, (200706), vol. 2, no. 6, ISSN 1860-7314, pages 672 - 677, XP002452557 [T] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/biot.200700049
 [T]  - MERSICH CHRISTA ET AL, "Peptides derived from a secretory yeast library restore factor VIII activity in the presence of an inhibitory antibody.", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING 1 SEP 2007, (20070901), vol. 98, no. 1, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 12 - 21, XP002452558 [T] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.21426